Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/23/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
09/23/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-34999
|
09/23/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-35001
|
09/24/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Black & Wadhams. Check no. 1018. (SC) | | |
09/25/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 20-35355
|
09/25/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: James A. Kohl. (SC). | | 20-35361
|
10/01/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Amended ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 16, 2020, at 9:00 am. Case Nos. 81252/81831. (SC). | | 20-36090
|
10/06/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants' Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-36633
|
10/06/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Exhibit to Docketing Statement - Exhibit 10-2. (SC) | | 20-36638
|
10/06/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Exhibit to Docketing Statement - Exhibit 24. (SC) | | 20-36640
|
11/20/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Case Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 20-42499
|
11/25/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. We consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 20-43110
|
12/08/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/3/20, 4/7/20, 4/29/20, and 6/25/20. To Court Reporter: Nancy Maldonado. (SC) | | 20-44553
|
02/23/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 9, 2021. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-05328
|
03/09/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. Nos. 81252/81831 (SC) | | 21-06887
|
03/10/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Appendix to Opening Brief. Due date: 10 days. Nos. 81252/81831 (SC) | | 21-06915
|
03/11/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. Vols. 1-19 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 3/11/21. Nos. 81252/81831 (SC) | | |
03/11/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. Nos. 81252/81831 (SC) | | 21-07122
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol 1. Nos. 81252/81831. (PAGES1 - 248 of VOLUMES 1 & 2 STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/16/21). (SC) | | 21-07248
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 2. Nos. 81252/81831. (PAGES1 - 248 of VOLUMES 1 & 2 STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/16/21). (SC) | | 21-07250
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 3. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-07254
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 4. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-07256
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 5. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-07257
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 6. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-07258
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 7. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-07260
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 8. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-07262
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 9. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-07264
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 10 (Part 1). Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-07266
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 10 (continued). Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-07268
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 10 (continued). Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-07269
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol 11. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-07271
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 12. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-07289
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 13. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-07290
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 14. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-07291
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 15. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-07292
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 15 (Part 2). Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-07293
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 16. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-07310
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 17. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-07311
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 18. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-07315
|
03/12/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 19. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-07318
|
03/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to Strike Volumes I and II of Appellants' Joint Appendix and to Strike Portions of Appellants' Opening Brief. Nos. 81252/81831 (SC) | | 21-07860
|
03/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion to Strike Volumes I and II of the Joint Appendix and Portions of the Opening Brief. Nos. 81252/81831 (SC) | | 21-08620
|
04/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Volumes I and II of Appellants' Joint Appendix and Portions of Appellants' Opening Brief. Nos. 81252/81831 (SC) | | 21-09431
|
04/02/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' answering brief due: April 26, 2021. Nos. 81252/81831 (SC) | | 21-09624
|
04/16/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk of this court shall strike pages 1 through 248 of volume 1 and 2 of the joint appendix. This court will disregard the references in the brief to the stricken portions of the appendix. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-10991
|
04/26/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief and Supplemental Appendix (First Request). Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-11922
|
04/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents shall have until May 26, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief and supplemental appendix. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-12126
|
05/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL) (SC) | | |
05/20/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-14589
|
05/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Supplement Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-14607
|
06/18/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' reply brief due: July 6, 2021. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-17622
|
07/06/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. Nos. 81252/81831 (SC) | | 21-19298
|
07/06/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 81252/81831 (SC) | | |
07/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to File Sur-Reply. Nos. 81252/81831 (SC) | | 21-20469
|
07/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Opposition to Motion to File Sur-Reply. Nos. 81252/81831 (SC) | | 21-21242
|
08/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondents have filed a motion to file a surreply on the basis that they wish to address an allegedly impermissible argument in appellants' reply brief. Respondents' motion to file a surreply is denied. Nos. 81252/81831 (SC) | | 21-22927
|
09/23/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. (Amended) Vol. 3. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-27477
|
09/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. (Amended) Vol. 9. Nos. 81252/81831 (SC) | | 21-27735
|
09/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. (Amended) Vol. 10. Nos. 81252/81831 (SC) | | 21-27736
|
09/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. (Amended) Vol. 12. Nos. 81252/81831 (SC) | | 21-27773
|
11/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 21-32703
|
11/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion for Reconsideration of Order Submitting Appeal Without Oral Argument. Nos. 81252/81831 (SC) | | 21-33483
|
01/06/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. On November 15, 2021, this court entered an order that submitted these appeals for consideration without oral argument. Appellants have moved for reconsideration of that order. See NRAP 27(3)(c)(2). The motion for reconsideration is denied. Nos 81252/81831. (SC) | | 22-00559
|
03/16/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS Nos 81252/81831. (SC) | | 22-08363
|
04/11/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 22-11249
|
04/11/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | |
04/29/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 12, 2022. Nos. 81252/81831. (SC) | | 22-11249
|