Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/03/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Micah S. Echols. (SC) | | |
12/03/2020 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC) | | 20-43785
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC) | | 20-43786
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC) | | 20-43788
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (SC) | | 20-43789
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4. (SC) | | 20-43790
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. (SC) | | 20-43794
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6. (SC) | | 20-43795
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 7. (SC) | | 20-43796
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 8. (SC) | | 20-43797
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 9. (SC) | | 20-43798
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 10. (SC) | | 20-43799
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 11. (SC) | | 20-43800
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 12. (SC) | | 20-43801
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 13. (SC) | | 20-43802
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 14. (SC) | | 20-43803
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 15. (SC) | | 20-43804
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 16. (SC) | | 20-43805
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 17. (SC) | | 20-43806
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 18. (SC) | | 20-43807
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 19. (SC) | | 20-43808
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 20. (SC) | | 20-43809
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 21. (SC) | | 20-43811
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 22. (SC) | | 20-43812
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 23. (SC) | | 20-43814
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 24. (SC) | | 20-43815
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 25. (SC) | | 20-43816
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 26. (SC) | | 20-43817
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 27. (SC) | | 20-43818
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 28. (SC) | | 20-43820
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 29. (SC) | | 20-43823
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 30. (SC) | | 20-43824
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 31. (SC) | | 20-43827
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 32. (SC) | | 20-43828
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 33. (SC) | | 20-43829
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 34. (SC) | | 20-43832
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 35. (SC) | | 20-43833
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 36. (SC) | | 20-43835
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 37. (SC) | | 20-43836
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 38. (SC) | | 20-43837
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 39. (SC) | | 20-43838
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 40. (SC) | | 20-43840
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 41. (SC) | | 20-43841
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 42. (SC) | | 20-43842
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 43. (SC) | | 20-43843
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 44. (SC) | | 20-43844
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 45. (SC) | | 20-43845
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 46. (SC) | | 20-43846
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 47. (SC) | | 20-43847
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 48. (SC) | | 20-43848
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 49. (SC) | | 20-43849
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 50. (SC) | | 20-43851
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 51. (SC) | | 20-43852
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 52. (SC) | | 20-43853
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 53. (SC) | | 20-43854
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 54. (SC) | | 20-43855
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 55. (SC) | | 20-43856
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 56. (SC) | | 20-43857
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 57. (SC) | | 20-43858
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 58. (SC) | | 20-43859
|
01/15/2021 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC) | | 21-01508
|
01/22/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Petitioners' petition for rehearing due: February 16, 2021. (SC) | | 21-01891
|
02/16/2021 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petitioners' Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 21-04578
|
02/16/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Micah S. Echols. (SC) | | |
03/02/2021 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC) | | 21-06063
|
03/16/2021 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petitioners' Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 21-07574
|
03/29/2021 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC (SC) | | 21-08964
|
04/23/2021 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu/Rehearing. (SC) | | 21-11711
|
04/23/2021 | Case Status Update | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |