Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/17/2021 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
11/17/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (A789336) (SC) | | 21-33171
|
11/18/2021 | Other | Justice Elissa Cadish disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings. (SC) | | |
12/01/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/13/20. To Court Reporter: De'Awna Takas. (SC) | | 21-34294
|
12/08/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Criminal Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-35000
|
01/18/2022 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. De'Awna Takas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/13/20. (SC) | | 22-01706
|
03/17/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. (First Request)(SC) | | 22-08484
|
03/29/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion in Part. Appellant's motion for a 120-day extension of time to file the opening brief is granted to the following extent. Appellant shall have until May 16, 2022, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 22-09690
|
05/16/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (Second Request) (SC) | | 22-15502
|
05/20/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 31, 2022. (SC) | | 22-16122
|
05/27/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-16975
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 1 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17012
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 2 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17026
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 3 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17045
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 5 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17016
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 6 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17079
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 7 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17015
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 8 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17078
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 9 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17051
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 10 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17024
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 11 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17020
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 13 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17025
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 15 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17081
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 16 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17089
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 17 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17027
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 19 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17028
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 20 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17082
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 21 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17080
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 22 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17034
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 23 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17076
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 24 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17030
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 25 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17032
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 26 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17033
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 27 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17037
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 28 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17036
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 29 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17038
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 30 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17039
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 31 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17040
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 32 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17041
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 33 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17042
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 34 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17043
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 35 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17044
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 36 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17073
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 37 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17083
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 38 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17046
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 39 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17047
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 40 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17048
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 41 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17050
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 42 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17052
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 43 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17059
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 44 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17060
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 45 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17062
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 46 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17065
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 47 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17067
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 48 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17069
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 49 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17071
|
05/27/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 50 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17072
|
05/27/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Permission to File Under Seal. (SC) | | 22-17075
|
05/31/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 12 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17090
|
05/31/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 12 of 50. - Duplicate - (SC) | | 22-17091
|
05/31/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 4 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17261
|
06/01/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 14 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17415
|
06/03/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 18 of 50. (SC) | | 22-17649
|
06/24/2022 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-20042
|
07/08/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Disapproving Stipulation. The clerk shall file the portion of the appendix received on June 3, 2022, under seal. The parties have filed a stipulation for a 60-day extension of time to file the answering brief. The stipulation is disapproved. Respondent shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 22-21578
|
07/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed (SEALED) Appellant's Appendix. (SC) | | |
07/11/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-21664
|
07/20/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until August 29, 2022, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 22-22759
|
08/24/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-26384
|
09/23/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (First Request) (SC) | | 22-29955
|
10/10/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's reply brief due: November 22, 2022. (SC) | | 22-31807
|
11/22/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Request for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. (Second Request) SC) | | 22-36700
|
12/05/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants reply brief due: December 22, 2022. (SC) | | 22-38102
|
12/21/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC). | | 22-40106
|
12/22/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. (SC). | | |
03/22/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the En Banc Court as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. (SC) | | 23-08815
|
04/07/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. The parties shall have seven days from the date of this order to file a motion for disqualification pursuant to NRAP 35 based on my disclosures. (SC) | | 23-10609
|
04/24/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC) | | 23-12693
|
06/28/2023 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1 [The Honorable Elissa F. Cadish, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC. (SC) | | 23-20686
|
07/14/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 23-22591
|
07/28/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until September 12, 2023, to file and serve a petition for rehearing. (SC) | | 23-24244
|
09/12/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 23-29861
|
09/12/2023 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing fee waived.(SC) | | |
09/26/2023 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1 [The Honorable Elissa Cadish, Justice, did not participate in the decision in this matter.] EN BANC. (SC) | | 23-31570
|
09/27/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Stay Remittitur Pending Filing and Resolution of Petition for Writ of Certiorari.(SC) | | 23-31745
|
10/13/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant has moved to stay issuance of the remittitur pending the filing of a petition for a writ of certiorari with the United States Supreme Court. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. Issuance of the remittitur is hereby stayed until February 20, 2024. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by February 20, 2024, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by February 20, 2024, the remittitur shall issue. (SC) | | 23-33495
|
12/29/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari. An Extension of Time (Petition for a Writ of Certiorari) to 02/23/2024.(SC) | | 23-42261
|
02/13/2024 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Stay of Remittitur Pending Final Disposition of Petition for Writ of Certiorari (SC) | | 24-05268
|
02/22/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion to extend the stay of the remittitur in this matter is granted. Issuance of the remittitur is hereby stayed until March 8, 2024. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by March 8, 2024, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by March 8, 2024, the remittitur shall issue. (SC) | | 24-06356
|
03/06/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed February 23, 2024 and placed on the docket as Case No. 23-6839. (SC) | | 24-08120
|
04/16/2024 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur.(SC) (REMITTITUR RECALLED PER 04/19/24 ORDER) | | 24-13185
|
04/16/2024 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.(SC) (REMITTITUR RECALLED PER 04/19/24 ORDER) | | |
04/19/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Recalling Remittitur. The clerk of this court shall recall the remittitur. Issuance of the remittitur shall be stayed until finial disposition of the United States Supreme Court certiorari proceedings. (SC). | | 24-13766
|
04/23/2024 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on 4/17/24. (REMITTITUR RECALLED PER 04/19/24 ORDER) .(SC) | | 24-13185
|
04/24/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.(SC) | | 24-14331
|
04/25/2024 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur.(SC) | | 24-14452
|
04/25/2024 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.(SC) | | |