+
Party Information
|
Role | Party Name | Represented By |
Appellant/Cross-Respondent | Nevada Organic Remedies LLC | Joel D. Henriod
(Former)
(Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP/Las Vegas)
David R. Koch
(King Scow Koch Durham LLC)
Daniel F. Polsenberg
(Former)
(Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP/Las Vegas)
Steven B. Scow
(King Scow Koch Durham LLC)
Daniel G. Scow
(King Scow Koch Durham LLC)
Abraham G. Smith
(Former)
(Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP/Las Vegas)
Brody R. Wight
(King Scow Koch Durham LLC)
|
Respondent | Green Leaf Farms Holdings LLC | Adam K. Bult
(Former)
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Travis F. Chance
(Former)
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Maximilien D. Fetaz
(Former)
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Adam R. Fulton
(Former)
(Jennings & Fulton, Ltd.)
|
Respondent | Greenmart of Nevada NLV LLC | Margaret A. McLetchie
(McLetchie Law)
Alina M. Shell
(McLetchie Law)
|
Respondent | Green Therapeutics LLC |
In Proper Person
|
Respondent | NevCann LLC | Adam K. Bult
(Former)
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Travis F. Chance
(Former)
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Maximilien D. Fetaz
(Former)
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Adam R. Fulton
(Former)
(Jennings & Fulton, Ltd.)
|
Respondent | Red Earth LLC | Adam K. Bult
(Former)
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Travis F. Chance
(Former)
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Maximilien D. Fetaz
(Former)
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Adam R. Fulton
(Former)
(Jennings & Fulton, Ltd.)
|
Respondent | The State of Nevada Department of Taxation | Ketan D. Bhirud
(Attorney General/Las Vegas)
Aaron D. Ford
(Attorney General/Carson City)
Theresa M. Haar
(Attorney General/Las Vegas)
David J. Pope
(Attorney General/Las Vegas)
Steven G. Shevorski
(Attorney General/Las Vegas)
|
Respondent/Cross-Appellant | ETW Management Group LLC | Adam K. Bult
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Travis F. Chance
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Maximilien D. Fetaz
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Adam R. Fulton
(Jennings & Fulton, Ltd.)
|
Respondent/Cross-Appellant | Global Harmony LLC | Adam K. Bult
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Travis F. Chance
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Maximilien D. Fetaz
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Adam R. Fulton
(Jennings & Fulton, Ltd.)
|
Respondent/Cross-Appellant | Herbal Choice Inc. | Adam K. Bult
(Former)
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Travis F. Chance
(Former)
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Sigal Chattah
(Chattah Law Group)
Maximilien D. Fetaz
(Former)
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Adam R. Fulton
(Former)
(Jennings & Fulton, Ltd.)
|
Respondent/Cross-Appellant | Just Quality, LLC | Adam K. Bult
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Travis F. Chance
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Maximilien D. Fetaz
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Adam R. Fulton
(Jennings & Fulton, Ltd.)
|
Respondent/Cross-Appellant | Libra Wellness Center, LLC | Adam K. Bult
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Travis F. Chance
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Maximilien D. Fetaz
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Adam R. Fulton
(Jennings & Fulton, Ltd.)
|
Respondent/Cross-Appellant | MMOF Vegas Retail, Inc. | Adam K. Bult
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Travis F. Chance
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Maximilien D. Fetaz
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Adam R. Fulton
(Jennings & Fulton, Ltd.)
|
Respondent/Cross-Appellant | Rombough Real Estate Inc. | Adam K. Bult
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Travis F. Chance
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Maximilien D. Fetaz
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Adam R. Fulton
(Jennings & Fulton, Ltd.)
|
Respondent/Cross-Appellant | THC Nevada LLC | Adam K. Bult
(Former)
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Travis F. Chance
(Former)
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Maximilien D. Fetaz
(Former)
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Adam R. Fulton
(Jennings & Fulton, Ltd.)
Amy L. Sugden |
Respondent/Cross-Appellant | Zion Gardens LLC | Adam K. Bult
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Travis F. Chance
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Maximilien D. Fetaz
(Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP/Las Vegas)
Adam R. Fulton
(Jennings & Fulton, Ltd.)
|
Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/25/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (Appellant Greenmart) (SC) | | |
09/25/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Appellant Greenmart) (SC) | | 19-39857
|
09/25/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellant Greenmart) (SC) | | 19-39859
|
09/25/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (Appellant Nevada Organic) (SC) | | |
09/25/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (Appellant Nevada Organic) (SC) | | 19-39861
|
09/25/2019 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Margaret A. McLetchie. (Appellant Greenmart) (SC) | | |
09/25/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 14 days. Opening brief due: 120 days. (SC) | | 19-39899
|
09/26/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Koch & Scow. Check no. 4027. (Appellant Nevada Organic) (SC) | | |
10/03/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Errata to Appellant's Case Appeal Statement (Appellant Greenmart). (SC) | | 19-41028
|
10/08/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross-Appeal. (Respondents/Cross-Appellants) (SC) | | |
10/08/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Respondents/Cross-Appellants) (SC) | | 19-41691
|
10/08/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Cross-Appeal) (SC) | | 19-41693
|
10/09/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested (Appellant/Cross-Respondent GreenMart of Nevada NLV LLC). (SC) | | 19-41838
|
10/15/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck. Check no. 295178. (Respondents/Cross-Appellants) (SC) | | |
10/16/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-42928
|
10/29/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellants/Cross-Respondents Motion to Consolidate Motion to Consolidate Appeals. (Nos. 79668/79669/79670/79671/79672 and 79673). (SC) | | 19-44538
|
10/31/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 11/01/19). (SC) | | |
11/01/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-45034
|
11/14/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Motion for Order Granting Extension of Time to File Civil Appeals Docketing Statement. (DETACHED DOCKETING STATEMENT AND FILED SEPERATELY PER ORDER 11/21/19). (SC) | | 19-46801
|
11/21/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellants and respondents/cross-appellants in these matters shall each have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why their appeals and cross-appeals should not be dismissed. Respondents in Docket No. 79671, 79672, and 79673, may file any replies within 14 days of service of appellant's response in each appeal. Respondents in Docket No. 79669 and 79670 may file any replies within 14 days of service of the latest-filed response in each appeal. Given this order, this court defers ruling upon the motions to consolidate these appeals with each other and Docket No. 79668. The briefing schedules in these appeals shall be suspended pending further order of this court. fn1[Docket No. 79669 - The clerk shall detach the docketing statement from the motion filed on November 14, 2019, and file it separately. To date, appellant/cross-respondent GreenMart of Nevada NLV, LLC, has failed to file a docketing statement in Docket No. 79669. Appellant/cross-respondent GreenMart of Nevada, NLV, LLC and respondents/cross-appellants in Docket No. 79670 have also failed to file docketing statements. These parties shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve their docketing statements or face sanctions.] fn4[GreenMart of Nevada NLV, LLC, shall file a separate response in each docket number.] Nos. 79669/79670/79671/79672/79673. (SC) | | 19-47713
|
11/21/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Docketing Statement - Part 1. (SC) | | 19-47720
|
11/21/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondents/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement - Part 2. (SC) | | 19-47740
|
11/21/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondents/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement - Part 3. (SC) | | 19-47741
|
11/22/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-47926
|
12/20/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent GreenMart of Nevada NLV LLC's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 19-51583
|
12/20/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Response of Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 19-51600
|
12/20/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 19-51644
|
01/14/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellants and respondents/cross-appellants in these matters shall each have 21 days from the date of this order to show cause why their appeals and cross-appeals should not be dismissed. Respondents in Docket No. 79671, 79672, and 79673, may file any replies within 14 days of service of appellant's response in each appeal. Respondents in Docket No. 79669 and 79670 may file any replies within 14 days of service of the latest-filed response in each appeal. The briefing schedules in these appeals remain suspended pending further order of this court. Nos. 79669/79670/79671/79672/79673. (SC). | | 20-01756
|
01/17/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC's Opening Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 01/17/20). (SC) | | 20-02524
|
01/17/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volumes 1-47 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 01/12/20). (SC) | | 20-02525
|
01/17/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 20-02610
|
02/04/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 20-04789
|
02/04/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 20-04917
|
02/18/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply to Greenmart of Nevada LLC's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 20-06689
|
02/26/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Respondents/Cross-Appellant's Green Therapeutics LLC Nevcann LLC, Green Leaf Farms Holdings LLC, and Red Earth LLC. (SC) | | 20-07790
|
03/13/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Vernon A. Nelson, Jr., as counsel for Respondent/Cross-Appellants Green Therapeutics, LLC). (SC) | | 20-10070
|
04/03/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing in Docket No. 79669, to Show Cause, Denying Motions to Consolidate, and Regarding Counsel. The appeal in Docket No. 79669 may proceed. Because they are in differing stages of the appellate process, the motion to consolidate Docket No. 79669 with the appeals in Docket Nos. 79668, 79670, 79671, 79672, and 79673 is denied. However, these cases shall be identified as related on this court's docket and may be consolidated at a later date. Appellants/cross-respondents in Docket No. 79669 shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Appellants and cross-appellants in Docket Nos. 79670, 79671, 79672, and 79673 shall each have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why their appeals and cross-appeals should not be dismissed. Respondents in Docket Nos. 79671, 79672, 79673 may file any replies within 14 days of service of appellant's response in each appeal. Respondent in Docket No. 79670 may file any reply within 14 days of service of the latest-filed response in that appeal. Counsel for certain cross-appellants in Docket No. 79669 have moved to withdraw. The motion is granted to the following extent. NRAP 46(e)(3); RPC 1.16(b)(5), (6). The clerk shall remove Adam K. Bult, Maximilien D. Fetaz and Travis F. Chance of Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP, as counsel of record for Green Therapeutics LLC, NEVCANN LLC, Green Leaf Farms Holdings LLC, and Red Earth LLC. As the motion is not signed by attorney Adam R. Fulton of Jennings & Fulton, Ltd., the motion is denied with respect to him, without prejudice. Nos. 79669/79670/79671/79672/79673. (SC). | | 20-12719
|
04/09/2020 | Motion | Filed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Respondent/Cross Appellants Green Therapeutics LLC, NEVCANN LLC, Green Leaf Farms Holdings LLC, and Red Earth LLC. (SC) | | 20-13595
|
04/15/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-14191
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC) | | 20-14192
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 2. (SC) | | 20-14193
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 3. (SC) | | 20-14194
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 4. (SC) | | 20-14195
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 5. (SC) | | 20-14196
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 6. (SC) | | 20-14200
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 7. (SC) | | 20-14201
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 8. (SC) | | 20-14202
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 9. (SC) | | 20-14203
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 10. (SC) | | 20-14205
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 11. (SC) | | 20-14206
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 12. (SC) | | 20-14207
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 13. (SC) | | 20-14209
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 14. (SC) | | 20-14210
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 15. (SC) | | 20-14211
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 16. (SC) | | 20-14214
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 17. (SC) | | 20-14216
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 18. (SC) | | 20-14218
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 19. (SC) | | 20-14220
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 20. (SC) | | 20-14221
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 21. (SC) | | 20-14222
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 22. (SC) | | 20-14226
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 23. (SC) | | 20-14229
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 24. (SC) | | 20-14230
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 25. (SC) | | 20-14233
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 26. (SC) | | 20-14234
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 27. (SC) | | 20-14237
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 28. (SC) | | 20-14238
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 29. (SC) | | 20-14239
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 30. (SC) | | 20-14240
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 31. (SC) | | 20-14242
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 32. (SC) | | 20-14243
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 33. (SC) | | 20-14244
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 34. (SC) | | 20-14245
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 35. (SC) | | 20-14246
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 36. (SC) | | 20-14248
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 37. (SC) | | 20-14252
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 38. (SC) | | 20-14253
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 39. (SC) | | 20-14257
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 40. (SC) | | 20-14258
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 41. (SC) | | 20-14261
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 42. (SC) | | 20-14262
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 43. (SC) | | 20-14263
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 44. (SC) | | 20-14264
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 45. (SC) | | 20-14266
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 46. (SC) | | 20-14267
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 46. (Duplicate). (SC) | | 20-14269
|
04/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 47. (SC) | | 20-14271
|
04/22/2020 | Motion | Filed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Respondents/Cross Appellants Green Therapeutics LLC. (SC). | | 20-15286
|
04/23/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw. The clerk shall remove attorney Adam R. Fulton as counsel of record for respondents/cross-appellants Green Therapeutics LLC, NEVCANN LLC, Green Leaf Farms Holdings LLC, and Red Earth LLC. Green Therapeutics LLC remains represented by attorney Vernon A. Nelson. NEVCANN LLC, Green Leaf Farms Holdings LLC, and Red Earth LLC may not proceed in this matter without counsel. These parties shall each have 30 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance in this court. (SC) | | 20-15453
|
04/29/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Attorney Vernon Nelson has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record for respondent/cross-appellant Green Therapeutics LLC. The motion is not accompanied by proof of service of the motion on Green Therapeutics LLC. Accordingly, the motion is denied without prejudice. (SC) | | 20-16190
|
04/30/2020 | Motion | Filed Amended Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Respondents/Cross-Appellants Green Therapeutics, LLC. (SC) | | 20-16443
|
05/04/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent GreenMart of Nevada NLV LLC's Opening Brief. (SC). | | 20-16717
|
05/04/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent GreenMart of Nevada NLV LLC's Notice of Joinder to Appellant/ Cross-Respondent Nevada Organic Remedies LLC's Appendices Volumes 1-47. (SC). | | 20-16718
|
05/20/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw. The clerk shall remove Mr. Nelson as counsel of record for Green Therapeutics LLC. Green Therapeutics may not proceed in this appeal without counsel. Green Therapeutics LLC shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance in this court. Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of Green Therapeutics LLC's cross-appeal. Green Therapeutics LLC will also be unable to file any documents in this matter. (SC). | | 20-19297
|
06/03/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents/cross-appellants ETW Management Group LLC, Global Harmony LLC, Herbal Choice Inc., Just Quality, LLC, Libra Wellness Center, LLC, MMOF Vegas Retail, Inc., Rombough Real Estate Inc., THC Nevada, LLC, and Zion Gardens LLC shall have until June 17, 2020, to file and serve an answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. (SC). | | 20-20855
|
06/04/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent The State of Nevada ex rel. Department of Taxation's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-21106
|
06/04/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent The State of Nevada ex rel. Department of Taxation's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-21107
|
06/17/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross Appeal.(REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 06/18/20). (SC) | | |
06/18/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. | | 20-22748
|
06/19/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross Appeal. (ETW Parties). (SC) | | 20-22950
|
06/19/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume I. (SC) | | 20-22951
|
06/19/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume II. (SC) | | 20-22952
|
06/19/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume III. (SC) | | 20-22955
|
06/19/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume IV. (SC) | | 20-22956
|
06/19/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume V. (SC) | | 20-22957
|
06/19/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume VI. (SC) | | 20-22958
|
06/19/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume VII. (SC) | | 20-22959
|
06/19/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume VIII. (SC) | | 20-22960
|
06/19/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume IX. (SC) | | 20-22961
|
06/19/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume X. (SC) | | 20-22962
|
06/19/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume XI. (SC) | | 20-22963
|
06/24/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Counsel (Sigal Chattah of the law firm of Chattah Law Group is hereby substituted as attorney of record for Herbal Choice Inc., in place and instead of Adam K. Bult, Maximilien D. Fetaz and Travis F. Chance of the law firm of Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP and Adam R. Fulton of the law firm of Jennings & Fulton, Ltd.). (SC) | | 20-23476
|
06/24/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Substitution of Counsel. (SC) | | 20-23532
|
07/06/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Daniel Polsenberg, Joel Henriod and Abraham Smith as counsel for Appellant/Cross-Respondent Nevada Organic Remedies). (SC). | | 20-24863
|
07/06/2020 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. (SC). | | 20-24864
|
07/08/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Dismissing Cross-Appeal in Part. The cross-appeals of NEVCANN LLC, Green Leaf Farms Holdings LLC, Red Earth LLC, and Green Therapeutics LLC are dismissed. The clerk shall amend the caption of this matter consistent with the caption on this order. NEVCANN LLC, Green Leaf Farms Holdings LLC, Red Earth LLC, and Green Therapeutics LLC shall not be permitted to file documents in this matter. (SC) | | 20-25246
|
07/10/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The motion of appellant/cross-respondent Nevada Organic Remedies (NOR) for an extension of time is granted to the following extent. NOR shall have until August 5, 2020, to file and serve its combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 20-25504
|
07/16/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant/Cross-Respondent Greenmart of Nevada NLV LLC's Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal due: August 3, 2020. (SC). | | 20-26116
|
07/17/2020 | Motion | Filed The State of Nevada Ex Rel. Department of Taxation's Motion to Extend Time To File Answering Brief to Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross Appeal. (SC) | | 20-26261
|
07/20/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC's Motion for Extension of Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC). | | 20-26499
|
07/29/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC shall have until August 19, 2020, to file and serve its combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. The State of Nevada Department of Taxation shall have until August 5, 2020, to file and serve an answering brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 20-27552
|
07/30/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent GreenMart of Nevada NLV LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal (Second Request). (SC) | | 20-27754
|
08/04/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. GreenMart shall have until August 19, 2020, to file and serve its combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 20-28359
|
08/05/2020 | Motion | Filed The State of Nevada Ex Rel. Department of Taxation's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief and Answering Brief to Respondents' Opening Brief on Cross Appeal (Second Request). (SC) | | 20-28732
|
08/05/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Nevada Organic Remedies Motion for Extension of Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 20-28918
|
08/10/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent GreenMart of Nevada NLV LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal (Third Request). (SC) | | 20-29316
|
08/13/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellants/cross-respondents Nevada Organic Remedies and GreenMart of Nevada NLV, LLC shall each have until September 18, 2020, to file and serve a combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. The State of Nevada Department of Taxation shall have until September 4, 2020, to file and serve an answering brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 20-29912
|
09/03/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Request to Extend Time to File Reply Brief and Answering Brief to Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 20-32525
|
09/11/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants/cross-respondents shall have until November 3, 2020, to file and serve their combined reply briefs on appeal and answering briefs on cross-appeal. The State of Nevada Department of Taxation shall have until November 3, 2020, to file and serve its answering brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 20-33604
|
10/14/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Stipulated Notice of Withdrawal of Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLC (Daniel F. Polsenberg, Joel D. Henriod, and Abraham G. Smith) (SC) | | 20-37828
|
10/22/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw. The clerk shall remove Daniel F. Polsenberg, Joel D. Henriod, and Abraham G. Smith of Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP as counsel of record for appellant/cross-respondent Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC (NOR). NOR remains represented in this matter by David R. Koch, Steven B. Scow, Daniel G. Scow, and Brody R. Wight of Koch & Scow, LLC. (SC) | | 20-38699
|
11/03/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Greenmart of Nevada NLV, LLC's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal. (SC) | | 20-40061
|
11/17/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant THC Nevada, LLC's Response to Appellant/Cross-Respondent Greenmart of Nevada NLV, LLC's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeals. (SC). | | 20-42014
|
11/24/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Herbal Choice Inc.'s Joinder to the Nevada, LLC's Response to Appellant/Cross-Respondent Greenmart of Nevada NLV, LLC's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal. (SC) | | 20-42771
|
11/24/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Greenmart of Nevada NLV, LLC's Reply to Respondent/Cross-Appellant THC Nevada LLC's Response to Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal. (SC) | | 20-42893
|
12/10/2020 | Other | Justice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Lawyers and Judges. (SC). | | |
12/14/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellant GreenMart of Nevada NLV LLC, has filed a motion to voluntarily dismiss this appeal. The motion is granted to the following extent. GreenMart's appeal is dismissed. The clerk shall modify the caption of this appeal consistent with the caption on this order. Should any party seek to dismiss the appeals of the remaining appellant or cross-appellants, that party should file a motion to dismiss within 14 days of the date of this order. (SC) | | 20-45195
|
12/17/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal. (SC) | | 20-45738
|
12/28/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent State of Nevada Department of Taxation's Motion to Dismiss Cross-Appeal for Mootness. (SC) | | 20-46586
|
01/04/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent Greenmart of Nevada NLV, LLC's Notice of Non-Opposition to the State of Nevada Department of Taxation's Motion to Dismiss Cross-Appeal on Mootness. (SC) | | 21-00066
|
01/08/2021 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order/Voluntary Dismissal. "This appeal and cross-appeal are dismissed." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC) | | 21-00676
|