Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/02/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC) | | |
01/02/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 19-00097
|
01/02/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 19-00099
|
01/03/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Robertson Law Firm. Check no. 27726. (SC) | | |
01/07/2019 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Margaret M. Crowley. (SC). | | 19-00718
|
01/16/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-02425
|
03/08/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for April 30, 2019, at 9:00 am. (SC). | | 19-10490
|
05/09/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC). | | 19-20293
|
05/14/2019 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC). | | 19-21156
|
05/23/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/12/17. To Court Reporter: Debora Cecere. (SC) | | 19-22630
|
05/23/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/04/18. To Court Reporter: Erin Ferretto. (SC) | | 19-22632
|
05/23/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/17/15. To Court Reporter: Christina Amundson. (SC) | | 19-22634
|
06/03/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Respondents' Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/10/17. To Court Reporter: None listed. (SC) | | 19-24073
|
07/10/2019 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Constance Eisenberg stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/10/17. (SC) | | 19-29257
|
07/10/2019 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Debora Cecere stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/12/17. (SC) | | 19-29259
|
07/10/2019 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Erin Ferretto stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/04/17. (SC) | | 19-29260
|
07/10/2019 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Christina Amundson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/17/15. (SC) | | 19-29264
|
08/08/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellants' Response due: 30 days. Respondents may file any reply within 14 days of service of appellants' response. Briefing is suspended. (SC) | | 19-33461
|
08/14/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC). | | 19-34276
|
08/23/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Partially Dismissing Appeal and Reinstating Briefing. Accordingly, this appeal is dismissed in regard to the March 6, 2018, order, and the December 11, 2018, judgment only. This appeal shall proceed in regard to the November 30, 2018, order denying NRCP 60(b) relief, and the briefing schedule is reinstated as follows. Appellants shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC). | | 19-35385
|
08/26/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-35543
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volumes 1- 8 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 08/26/19). (SC) | | |
08/26/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected Appellant's Appendix due: 5 days. (SC) | | 19-35631
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 1. (SC) | | 19-35667
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 2. (SC) | | 19-35668
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 3. (SC) | | 19-35669
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 4. (SC) | | 19-35670
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 5. (SC) | | 19-35673
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 6. (SC) | | 19-35674
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 7. (SC) | | 19-35676
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 8 - Part 1. (SC) | | 19-35679
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 8 - Part 2. (SC) | | 19-35680
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 8 - Part 3. (SC) | | 19-35689
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 9 - Part 1. (SC) | | 19-35693
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 9 - Part 2. (SC) | | 19-35695
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 10. (SC) | | 19-35697
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 11. (SC) | | 19-35698
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 12. (SC) | | 19-35699
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 13. (SC) | | 19-35700
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 14. (SC) | | 19-35701
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 15. (SC) | | 19-35702
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 16. (SC) | | 19-35703
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 17. (SC) | | 19-35704
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 18. (SC) | | 19-35705
|
08/26/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 19. (SC) | | 19-35706
|
09/04/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' Answering Brief due: October 9, 2019. (SC). | | 19-36951
|
10/09/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 19-41860
|
10/09/2019 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix Volume 1. (SC) | | 19-41862
|
11/07/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: November 22, 2019. (SC) | | 19-45839
|
11/19/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 19-47361
|
11/19/2019 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
05/29/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC) | | 20-20372
|
08/06/2020 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded with instructions." Before: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Cadish. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Cadish. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 53. NNP20-RP/JH/EC. (SC). | | 20-28925
|
08/24/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents' Petition for Rehearing. (REJECTED PER 8/24/20 NOTICE). (SC) | | |
08/24/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 20-31205
|
08/24/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 20-31223
|
08/24/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid on Rehearing. E-Payment $150.00 from Brian R. Irvine. (SC) | | |
10/01/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answering to Petition for Rehearing. Appellants' Answer due: 14 days. (SC). | | 20-36040
|
10/14/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's answer to petition for rehearing due: October 29, 2020. (SC) | | 20-37810
|
10/26/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 20-39120
|
11/03/2020 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC) | | 20-39991
|
11/10/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' petition for en banc reconsideration due: December 1, 2020. (SC) | | 20-41177
|
12/01/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents' Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 20-43451
|
12/23/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Appellants' Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 20-46359
|
01/04/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' answer to petition for en banc reconsideration due: January 20, 2021. (SC) | | 21-00036
|
01/15/2021 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellants' Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 21-01399
|
02/23/2021 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. However, we clarify that neither party may present any new arguments or evidence on remand; the district court's consideration of the factors set forth in Yochum v. Davis, 98 Nev. 484, 486, 653 P.2d 1215, 1216 (1982), is limited to the record currently before the court. It is so ORDERED. (SC)
Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC | | 21-05280
|
03/22/2021 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 21-08094
|
03/22/2021 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
04/02/2021 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 25, 2021. (SC) | | 21-08094
|