Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/30/2014 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived - Criminal. | | |
05/30/2014 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 14-17632
|
06/06/2014 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. | | 14-18405
|
06/12/2014 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 14-19381
|
09/29/2014 | Motion | Filed Request for Extension of Time within which to File Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 14-32352
|
10/03/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: December 29, 2014. | | 14-32969
|
01/06/2015 | Motion | Filed Second and Final Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 15-00309
|
01/07/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix. | | 15-00685
|
01/14/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief and appendix received on January 7, 2015. Respondent's Answering Brief due: 30 days. The clerk of this court shall also file the supplemental appendix received on January 7, 2015. | | 15-01451
|
01/14/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 15-01452
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 1. | | 15-01453
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 2 Part 1. | | 15-01454
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 3 Part 1. | | 15-01455
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 4 Part 1. | | 15-01456
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 5 Part 1. | | 15-01457
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 6 Part 1. | | 15-01458
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 7 Part 1. | | 15-01459
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 8 Part 1. | | 15-01460
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 9 Part 1. | | 15-01461
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 10 Part 1. | | 15-01462
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 11 Part 1. | | 15-01463
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 12 Part 1. | | 15-01465
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 13 Part 1. | | 15-01466
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 14 Part 1. | | 15-01467
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 15 Part 1. | | 15-01468
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 16 Part 1. | | 15-01469
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 17 Part 1. | | 15-01470
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 18 Part 1. | | 15-01471
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 19 Part 1. | | 15-01473
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 20. | | 15-01474
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 21. | | 15-01475
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix 22 Part 1. | | 15-01476
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 23. | | 15-01478
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 24. | | 15-01479
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 25 Part 1. | | 15-01480
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 26. | | 15-01481
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Supplemental Appendix Vol. 1 Part 1. | | 15-01482
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Supplemental Appendix Vol. 2 Part 1. | | 15-01483
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Supplemental Appendix Vol. 3 Part 1. | | 15-01484
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Supplemental Appendix Vol. 4 Part 1. | | 15-01485
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Supplemental Appendix Vol. 5 Part 1. | | 15-01486
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Supplemental Appendix Vol. 6 Part 1. | | 15-01487
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Supplemental Appendix Vol. 7 Part 1. | | 15-01488
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Supplemental Appendix Vol. 8 Part 1. | | 15-01489
|
01/14/2015 | Appendix | Filed Supplemental Appendix Vol. 9 Part 1. | | 15-01490
|
01/14/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion to Transmit Select DVDs Filed as Exhibits with Appellant's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. | | 15-01552
|
01/27/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Exhibits 146 and 154 to appellant's petition for writ of habeas corpus, filed on May 5, 2011 due: 30 days. | | 15-02880
|
02/13/2015 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time (Answering Brief). | | 15-04820
|
02/13/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: March 16, 2015 | | 15-04830
|
03/16/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time (Answering Brief). | | 15-08045
|
03/20/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: April 15, 2015. | | 15-08563
|
04/07/2015 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 15-10541
|
05/08/2015 | Motion | Filed Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 15-14058
|
05/15/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Reply Brief due: July 6, 2015. | | 15-14923
|
07/06/2015 | Motion | Filed Request for Extension of Time within which to File Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 15-20430
|
07/17/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: August 3, 2015. | | 15-21660
|
08/04/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 15-23422
|
08/04/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellants Reply Appendix. | | 15-23423
|
08/04/2015 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. | | |
04/01/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Attorney. Heather Fraley appearing as counsel for appellant. | | 16-10177
|
02/08/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This matter was previously submitted on the record and briefs filed herein. Upon further review, the court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 17-04537
|
03/28/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, May 1, 2017, at 10:.30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City. | | 17-10206
|
04/17/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 17-12508
|
04/17/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Allow Longer Oral Argument. | | 17-12695
|
04/19/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Oral Argument. The oral argument scheduled for May 1, 2017, at 10:30 a.m., in Carson City will be limited to 60 minutes. | | 17-12939
|
05/01/2017 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
09/28/2017 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." EN BANC | | 17-32999
|
10/17/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. | | 17-35409
|
11/29/2017 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). | | 17-41025
|
12/26/2017 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Original Exhibits: 146 & 154. | | 17-44447
|
12/26/2017 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
01/05/2018 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 27, 2017. | | 17-44447
|