Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/12/2014 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality. | | |
11/12/2014 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 14-37299
|
11/12/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 14-37302
|
11/13/2014 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief: | | 14-37366
|
11/19/2014 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion For Reconsideration of the Court's Exemption of this Appeal from the Settlement Conference Program. | | 14-38158
|
11/21/2014 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Joint Response to Appellant City of Fernley's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Exemption of this Appeal from the Settlement Conference Program. | | 14-38426
|
11/25/2014 | Motion | Filed Reply in Support of Appellant's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Exemption of this Appeal from the Settlement Conference Program. | | 14-38924
|
12/01/2014 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 14-39118
|
12/01/2014 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 14-39119
|
12/02/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Joint Notice Directing Appellant to File a Transcript Request Form pursuant to NRAP 9. | | 14-39249
|
12/12/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice Regarding Status of Transcript Request Form. | | 14-40484
|
12/23/2014 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/2/14. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Court Reporting/Litigation Services. | | 14-41955
|
12/29/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. We grant the motion and refer this appeal to the settlement program. Accordingly, briefing in this matter is stayed. Further, the assigned settlement judge shall expedite settlement proceedings to the extent possible. | | 14-42290
|
01/05/2015 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Margaret M. Crowley. | | 15-00128
|
02/09/2015 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement program. | | 15-04273
|
02/12/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice to Court (Dan Schwartz to Replace Kate Marshall in the caption as State Treasurer). | | 15-04715
|
02/19/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. | | 15-05413
|
02/19/2015 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. Appellant previously filed a transcript request form. Sunshine Court Reporting Services: 30 days from the date of this order to prepare and deliver the requested transcript and to file a certificate with this court acknowledging the delivery of the transcript. Appellant: 60 days to file an opening brief and appendix. Fn1 [The clerk shall attach a copy of that transcript request form to this order.] | | 15-05440
|
02/26/2015 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Gail R. Willsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/02/14. | | 15-06155
|
03/02/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service (Court Reporter delivered copies of the Transcript). | | 15-06448
|
03/24/2015 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extensions of time to File Opening Brief, Appendix and Answering Briefs. | | 15-08996
|
04/01/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 20, 2015. | | 15-09774
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 1. | | 15-15471
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 2. | | 15-15472
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 3. | | 15-15473
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 4. | | 15-15475
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 5. | | 15-15476
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 6. | | 15-15477
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 7. | | 15-15478
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 8. | | 15-15480
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 9. | | 15-15481
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 10. | | 15-15482
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 11. | | 15-15484
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 12. | | 15-15485
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 13. | | 15-15486
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 14. | | 15-15487
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 15. | | 15-15489
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 16. | | 15-15490
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 17. | | 15-15491
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 18. | | 15-15492
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 19. | | 15-15493
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 20. | | 15-15495
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 21. | | 15-15496
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 22. | | 15-15497
|
05/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 23. | | 15-15498
|
05/20/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service for Joint Appendix. | | 15-15501
|
05/20/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 15-15544
|
06/26/2015 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answering Brief due: July 6, 2015. | | 15-19541
|
07/07/2015 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to Exceed the Type-Volume Limitation for their Joint Answering Brief. | | 15-20494
|
07/08/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief received on July 7, 2015. Reply Brief due: 30 days. | | 15-20707
|
07/08/2015 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Joint Answering Brief. | | 15-20712
|
08/07/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 15-23933
|
08/07/2015 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
12/15/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address (Joshua Hicks counsel for Appellant). | | 15-38202
|
12/28/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument. | | 15-39682
|
01/14/2016 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 4. EN BANC | | 16-01248
|
02/01/2016 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing Pursuant to NRAP 40. | | 16-03385
|
02/01/2016 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing fee waived | | |
02/19/2016 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "We deny the petition for rehearing." NRAP 40(c). En Banc. | | 16-05402
|
03/16/2016 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 16-08326
|
03/16/2016 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
03/25/2016 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 18, 2016. | | 16-08326
|
03/28/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter to the publishers regarding corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 59837/66177/66851/63180 (Letter entered in no. 59837 as document no. 16-09657.) | | |