Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/23/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
07/23/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 19-31092
|
07/23/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 19-31095
|
07/25/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Wright Finlay and Zak. Check no. 2276. (SC) | | |
07/25/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 19-31456
|
07/25/2019 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC). | | 19-31562
|
08/05/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for November 19, 2019, at 10:30 am. (SC). | | 19-32854
|
08/15/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-34450
|
12/02/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC). | | 19-48820
|
12/03/2019 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 19-48948
|
12/10/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/16/19, 04/17/19, 04/18/19, 04/23/19, 04/24/19 and 05/20/19. To Court Reporter: Sandra Harrell. (SC) | | 19-50003
|
01/27/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Disassociation and Withdrawal of Counsel (Dana Jonathon Nitz). (SC) | | 20-03678
|
02/11/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sandra Harrell stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/16/19, 04/17/19, 04/18/19, 04/23/19, 04/24/19 and 05/20/19. (SC) | | 20-05732
|
02/21/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Disassociation and Withdrawal of Counsel (Matthew S. Carter is no longer associated with Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP). (SC) | | 20-07129
|
03/02/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 16, 2020. (SC). | | 20-08226
|
03/10/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Lindsay D. Robbins as counsel for Appellant). | | 20-09505
|
03/10/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-09507
|
03/16/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall remove attorney Matthew S. Carter as counsel for appellant and from the service list in this appeal. Appellant shall be represented by Lindsay D. Robbins, Robin Prema Wright, Christina V. Miller, and Wright Finlay & Zak, LLP. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 15, 2020. (SC). | | 20-10206
|
04/06/2020 | Motion | Filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC). | | 20-12912
|
04/10/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 15, 2020. (SC). | | 20-13667
|
05/04/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time (Opening Brief and Appendix). (SC). | | 20-16793
|
05/08/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 15, 2020. (SC). | | 20-17509
|
06/15/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC). | | 20-22247
|
06/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume I. (SC). | | 20-22249
|
06/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume II. (SC). | | 20-22250
|
06/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume III. (SC). | | 20-22251
|
06/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume IV. (SC). | | 20-22252
|
06/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume V. (SC). | | 20-22254
|
06/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume VI. (SC). | | 20-22256
|
06/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume VII. (SC). | | 20-22258
|
06/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume VIII. (SC). | | 20-22259
|
06/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume IX. (SC). | | 20-22260
|
06/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume X. (SC). | | 20-22261
|
06/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume XI. (SC). | | 20-22262
|
06/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume XII. (SC). | | 20-22265
|
06/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume XIII. (SC). | | 20-22267
|
06/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume XIV. (SC). | | 20-22268
|
06/15/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume XV. (SC). | | 20-22270
|
07/07/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief (First Request). (SC). | | 20-24958
|
07/07/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondents' Answering Brief due: August 14, 2020. (SC). | | 20-25009
|
08/11/2020 | Motion | Filed Unopposed Motion to Extend time to File Respondent's Answering Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 20-29549
|
08/20/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: September, 14 ,2020. (SC) | | 20-30700
|
09/10/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief (Third Request). (SC) | | 20-33377
|
09/17/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until October 14, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 20-34268
|
09/25/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Stay Briefing. (SC) | | 20-35382
|
10/02/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Respondent's Motion to Stay Briefing. (SC) | | 20-36352
|
10/08/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Appellant shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file a status report regarding the status of this appeal and the proceedings in Docket No. 81129. (SC) | | 20-36934
|
02/05/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Status Report. (SC) | | 21-03656
|
02/12/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed the status report and notes that briefing is ongoing in Docket No. 81129 and asks that the briefing schedule in the instant appeal remain suspended. The request is denied. The briefing schedule is reinstated as follows. Respondent shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-04235
|
06/14/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-17077
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-17080
|
07/12/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: July 28, 2021. (SC) | | 21-19896
|
07/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-21263
|
08/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion requesting a second extension of time to file the reply brief. The motion is denied. Appellant's reply brief due: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-22332
|
08/09/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-23126
|
08/10/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
01/31/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Substitution of Attorneys. (SC) | | 22-03278
|
02/18/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] RP/JH/MG (SC) | | 22-05530
|
03/15/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-08124
|
03/15/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
03/22/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 16, 2022. (SC) | | 22-08124
|