Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/07/2014 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | | |
03/07/2014 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 14-07425
|
03/11/2014 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 14-07889
|
03/18/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due date: 10 days. (Findings of Fact filed 3/17/14) | | 14-08719
|
03/21/2014 | Order/Incoming | Filed District court order. Certified copy of order Findings of Fact filed in district court on 3/17/2014. | | 14-09152
|
04/01/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | | 14-10282
|
04/03/2014 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request . | | 14-10668
|
07/07/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 14-22018
|
07/16/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until October 6, 2014, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. | | 14-23070
|
07/24/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Endorsement of Pro Per Document Filed July 21,2014. | | 14-24184
|
07/25/2014 | Motion | Filed Response to Notice of Endorsement of Pro Per Document. | | 14-24266
|
08/13/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk of this court shall file the proper person letter received on July 21, 2014. The motion for a remand is denied. Because appellant is represented by counsel in this appeal and the opening brief has not yet been filed, his request to file a supplemental opening brief is also denied. | | 14-26588
|
08/13/2014 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion Requesting to File a Proper Person Supplemental Opening Brief. | | 14-23561
|
10/06/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 14-33116
|
10/10/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. The motion for a 90-day extension of time is denied. Appellant's opening brief due: December 5, 2014. | | 14-33700
|
12/05/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 14-39731
|
12/26/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 9, 2015. | | 14-42167
|
01/09/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 15-00972
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 1. | | 15-00973
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 2. | | 15-00974
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 3. | | 15-00976
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 4. | | 15-00977
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 5. | | 15-00978
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 6. | | 15-00979
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 7. | | 15-00982
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 8. | | 15-00983
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 9. | | 15-00984
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 10. | | 15-00985
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 11. | | 15-01009
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 12. | | 15-01010
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 13. | | 15-01011
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 14. | | 15-01018
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 15. | | 15-01019
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 16. | | 15-01020
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 18. | | 15-01021
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 19. | | 15-01022
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 17. | | 15-01024
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 20. | | 15-01025
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 21. | | 15-01026
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 22. | | 15-01027
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 23. | | 15-01029
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 24. | | 15-01030
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 25. | | 15-01033
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 26. | | 15-01037
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 27. | | 15-01038
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 28. | | 15-01039
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 29. | | 15-01040
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 30. | | 15-01041
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 31. | | 15-01042
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 32. | | 15-01043
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 33. | | 15-01044
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 34. | | 15-01045
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 35. | | 15-01046
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 36. | | 15-01047
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 37. | | 15-01048
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 38. | | 15-01049
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 39. | | 15-01050
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 40. | | 15-01052
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 41. | | 15-01053
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 42. | | 15-01054
|
01/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief Volume 43. | | 15-01063
|
02/10/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). | | 15-04345
|
02/13/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: April 10, 2015. | | 15-04879
|
04/10/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time Second Request (Answering Brief). | | 15-10829
|
04/17/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: May 11, 2015. | | 15-11625
|
05/07/2015 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 15-13969
|
05/07/2015 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Vol 1. | | 15-13980
|
05/07/2015 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Vol 2. | | 15-13982
|
06/08/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. (60 days) | | 15-17348
|
06/12/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: August 7, 2015. | | 15-17964
|
08/07/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. | | 15-23828
|
08/14/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: October 6, 2015. | | 15-24608
|
10/08/2015 | Motion | Filed Untimely Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. | | 15-30558
|
10/16/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a third extension of time (60 days) to file the reply brief. The motion is denied. Reply Brief due: November 13, 2015. | | 15-31528
|
11/13/2015 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Enlarge Page Limitation on Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 15-34723
|
11/18/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for leave to file a reply brief in excess of the type-volume limitation is granted. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief received on November 13, 2015. | | 15-35252
|
11/18/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 15-35254
|
11/18/2015 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
02/08/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This matter was previously submitted on the briefs and record filed herein. Upon further review, the court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 17-04539
|
02/23/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, April 3, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 17-06263
|
03/20/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 17-09208
|
04/03/2017 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter From Las Vegas Review-Journal to Request Camera Access to the Nevada Supreme Court Arguments Scheduled for Monday, April 3 (via fax). | | 17-10891
|
04/03/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Media Request. Permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the court proceedings. Wesley Juhl of the Las Vegas Review Journal is designated as the pool coordinator. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before 10:00 a.m. | | 17-10913
|
04/03/2017 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
10/05/2017 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cherry, C.J. Majority: Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich.133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 73. EN BANC | | 17-33799
|
10/23/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Rehearing. | | 17-36273
|
11/06/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Petition for Rehearing due: November 22, 2017. Failure to comply with this order will result in the clerk of this court issuing the remittitur forthwith. | | 17-37992
|
11/22/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. | | 17-40343
|
01/19/2018 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). En Banc. | | 18-02613
|
02/13/2018 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 18-05867
|
02/13/2018 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
03/09/2018 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 22, 2018. | | 18-05867
|