Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/09/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
02/09/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-03842
|
02/09/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-03845
|
02/10/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance. (SC) | | 21-03985
|
02/17/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices of Michael F. Bohn. Check no. 16692. (SC) | | |
02/17/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-04684
|
02/19/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC) | | 21-04935
|
02/26/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC) | | 21-05850
|
03/01/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC) | | 21-05985
|
05/26/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation Extending the Date to File Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-15143
|
05/27/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 1, 2021. (SC) | | 21-15178
|
07/01/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-19031
|
07/07/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to permit the late filing of Appendix. (SC) | | 21-19430
|
07/09/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Directing Filing of Docketing Statement. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the appendix. Respondent shall have 30 days from service of the appendix to file and serve the answering brief. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement. fn1[Given that appellant has already filed the opening brief, this court waives the requirement to comply with NRAP 9 in this instance.] (SC) | | 21-19709
|
07/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix 1. (SC) | | 21-20354
|
07/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix 2. (SC) | | 21-20355
|
07/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix 3. (SC) | | 21-20356
|
07/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix 4. (SC) | | 21-20357
|
07/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix 5. (SC) | | 21-20358
|
07/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix 6. (SC) | | 21-20359
|
07/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix 7. (SC) | | 21-20360
|
07/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix 8. (SC) | | 21-20361
|
07/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix 9. (SC) | | 21-20366
|
07/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix 10. (SC) | | 21-20390
|
07/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix 11. (SC) | | 21-20391
|
07/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix 12. (SC) | | 21-20393
|
07/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix 13. (SC) | | 21-20392
|
07/15/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-20520
|
07/23/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Lilith V. Xara of the law firm of Akerman LLP as counsel for Respondent). (SC) | | 21-21337
|
08/13/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-23684
|
08/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Appendix. (SC) | | 21-23685
|
09/27/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
10/18/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 21-29756
|
10/18/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
10/18/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
11/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 11/15/21) (SC) | | |
11/15/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 21-32695
|
11/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (COA) | | 21-32890
|
11/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (Duplicate filing) (COA) | | |
12/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw. Akerman LLP has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel for respondent. The motion is granted. The clerk shall remove Akerman LLP as counsel of record for respondent. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance in this court. (COA) | | 21-34774
|
01/05/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 1/5/22)(SC) | | |
01/05/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 22-00375
|
01/27/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. (COA) | | 22-02691
|
01/27/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA) | | 22-02790
|
01/27/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC) | | |
02/22/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
02/22/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
02/22/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
02/22/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-05759
|
02/22/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
03/04/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 23, 2022. (SC) | | 22-05759
|