Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81224
Short Caption:DIAMOND NAT. RES. PROT. AND CONSERVATION ASS'N VS. DIAMOND VALLEY RANCH, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Eureka Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CV 1902-348Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/02/2021 at 9:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:06/02/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/26/2020Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC)
05/26/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) - Part 1. (SC)20-19827
05/26/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal - Part 2. (SC)20-19828
05/26/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal - Part 3. (SC)20-19830
05/26/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal - Part 4. (SC)20-19831
05/26/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal - Part 5. (SC)20-19832
05/26/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 14 days. Opening brief due: 120 days. (SC)20-19844
05/27/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Leonard Law PC. Check no. 1107. (SC)
06/03/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/10/19, 12/11/19. To Court Reporter: Michel Loomis. (SC)20-20897
06/08/2020Filing FeeCross-Appeal Filing Fee Waived. State/County/Municipality. (State Engineer) (SC)
06/08/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (State Engineer) (SC)20-21351
06/08/2020Filing FeeCross-Appeal Filing Fee Waived. State/County/Municipality. (Eureka Cty.) (SC)
06/08/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (Eureka Cty.) (SC)20-21353
06/11/2020MotionFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Unopposed Motion to Modify Caption and Redesignate Parties. (SC)20-21864
06/16/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-22496
06/18/2020Docketing StatementFiled Respondent Sadler Ranch, LLC and Ira & Montira Renner's Response to Docketing Statement. (SC)20-22797
06/24/2020Docketing StatementFiled Respondent/Cross Appellant Eureka County's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-23470
06/26/2020Docketing StatementFiled Respondent/Cross Appellant State Engineer's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-23805
07/06/2020MotionFiled Appellant/Cross Respondents' Motion to Exceed Page Limit.(SC)20-24872
07/06/2020MotionFiled Appellant/Cross Respondents' Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Stay Pending Appeal (Relief Requested by July 10, 2020) - PART 1. (SC)20-24873
07/06/2020MotionFiled Appellant/Cross Respondents' Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Stay Pending Appeal (Relief Requested by July 10, 2020) - PART 2 (Exhibits 3-14). (SC)20-24875
07/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents' Intent to File Opposition to Appellants' Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Stay Pending Appeal. (SC)20-24879
07/07/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents' Notice of Intent to File Responses to Appellants' Emergency Motion and Motion to Exceed Page Limits. (SC)20-24898
07/07/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Eureka County's Joinder to Appellants' Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27 (e) for Stay Pending Appeal. (SC)20-25003
07/07/2020Notice/IncomingFiled State Engineer's Joinder to DNRPCA Appellants' Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Stay Pending Appeal. (SC)20-25011
07/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions to Modify Caption and to Exceed Page Limit. The clerk of this court shall modify this docket's caption to conform to the caption on this order. The motion for leave to file a stay motion with excess pages is granted; the emergency stay motion was filed on July 6, 2020. Any oppositions to the stay motion are due on or before July 13, 2020. (SC)20-25082
07/08/2020MotionFiled Sadler Ranch, LLC and Ira & Montira Renner Response to Motion to Exceed Page Limits. (SC)20-25105
07/13/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Sadler Ranch, LLC and IRA & Montira Renner's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation for Response to DNRCPA's Emergency Motion for Stay. (SC)20-25736
07/13/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Sadler Ranch, LLC and IRA and Montira Renner's Response to Emergency Motion for Stay. (SC)20-25739
07/13/2020MotionFiled Bailey Respondents' Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Opposition to Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. (SC)20-25745
07/13/2020MotionFiled Bailey Respondents' Opposition to Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. (SC)20-25746
07/14/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Exceed Page Limit. Respondents' motions for leave to file oppositions to appellants' emergency stay motion in excess of the NRAP 27(d)(2) page limit are granted. Respondents' oppositions were filed on July 13, 2020. (SC)20-25888
07/15/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Exceed Page Limit (DNRPCA Appellants' Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Stay). (SC).20-26012
07/15/2020MotionFiled DNRPCA Appellants' Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Stay. (SC).20-26013
07/16/2020MotionFiled Bailey Respondents' Motion for Leave to File Surreply Re DNRPCA Appellants' Motion for Stay Pending Appeal (DETACHED APPELLANTS' SUREPLY PER 8/18/20 ORDER). (SC)20-26098
07/16/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Eureka County's Joinder to DNRPCA Appellants' Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Stay. (SC)20-26104
08/18/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Stay. We deny the motion for stay. fn1 [Appellants' July 15, 2020, motion for leave to file a reply that exceeds the page limit is granted; the reply was filed on July 15, 2020.] fn2 [The Bailey respondents' motion for leave to file a sur-reply is granted; the clerk of this court shall detach from the July 16, 2020, motion and file the Baileys' sur-reply.] (SC)20-30417
08/18/2020MotionFiled Bailey Respondents' Surreply Re DNRPCA Appellants' Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Stay Pending Appeal. (DETACHED FROM 7/16/20 MOTION AND FILED PER 8/18/20 ORDER.) (SC)20-30424
09/23/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (State Engineer's). (SC)20-34964
09/23/2020BriefFiled DNRPCA Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-35040
09/23/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. I (SC)20-35041
09/23/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. II (SC)20-35042
09/23/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. III (SC)20-35043
09/23/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. IV (SC)20-35044
09/23/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. V (SC)20-35045
09/23/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. VI (SC)20-35046
09/23/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. VII (SC)20-35048
09/23/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. VIII (SC)20-35049
09/23/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. IX (SC)20-35052
09/23/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. X (SC)20-35051
09/23/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. XI (SC)20-35053
09/23/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. XII (SC)20-35056
09/23/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. XIII (SC)20-35058
09/23/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. XIV (SC)20-35059
09/23/2020BriefFiled Joinder to Brief Eureka County, Joinder to DNRPCA Appellants' Opening Brief and Appellant State Engineer's Opening Brief (SC)20-35100
10/01/2020BriefFiled Joinder to Brief of Diamond Valley Ranch, LLC; American First Federal, Inc.; Berg properties California, LLC; and Blanco ranch, LLC in the Opening Briefs in Support of the Groundwater Management Plan. (SC)20-36048
10/19/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents Timothy Lee Baily, Constance Marie Bailey, Fred Bailey and Carolyn Bailey shall have until November 6, 2020, to file and serve their answering brief. (SC).20-38300
10/21/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents Ira R. Renner, Montira Renner and Sadler Ranch, LLC shall have until November 6, 2020, to file and serve their answering brief. (SC)20-38553
11/06/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion for Excess Pages Type-Volume Limitation for Answering Brief. (Bailey Respondents). (DETACHED ANSWERING BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 12/7/20). (SC)20-40723
11/06/2020BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief (Sadler Ranch, LLC, Ira Renner, and Montira Renner). (SC)20-40761
11/13/2020MotionFiled Motion to Associate Counsel Daniel Moshe Orthner. (SC)20-41609
11/13/2020MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Brief of Amicus Curiae Pacific Legal Foundation in Support of Respondents. (DETACHED AMICUS BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 12/23/20). (SC)20-41611
11/18/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants represented by Leonard Law, PC shall have until December 4, 2020, to file and serve their response to Pacific Legal Foundation's motion to file brief of amicus curiae in support of respondents. (SC)20-42036
11/18/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant Tim Wilson, Nevada State Engineer shall have until December 4, 2020, to file and serve a response to Pacific Legal Foundation's motion to file brief of amicus curiae in support of respondents. (SC)20-42103
11/18/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant Eureka County shall have until December 4, 2020, to file and serve a response to Pacific Legal Foundation's motion to file brief of amicus curiae in support of respondents. (SC)20-42104
11/19/2020BriefFiled Respondent Sadler Ranch, LLC, IRA, and Montira Renner's Joinder to Amicus Brief filed by Pacific Law Foundation. (SC)20-42324
12/04/2020MotionFiled DNRPCA Appellants' Opposition to Pacific Legal Foundation's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. (SC)20-44005
12/04/2020MotionFiled Eureka County's Joinder to DNRPCA Appellants' Opposition to Pacific Legal Foundation's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. (SC)20-44012
12/04/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Substitution of Appellant State Engineer. (SC)20-44013
12/04/2020Notice/IncomingFiled State Engineer's Joinder to DNRPCA Appellants' Opposition to Pacific Legal Foundation's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. (SC)20-44014
12/04/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time for Appellants' to File Reply Briefs. (SC)20-44069
12/07/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion filed by respondents Timothy Lee Bailey, Constance Marie Bailey, Fred Bailey, and Carolyn Bailey (the Bailey respondents) for leave to file an answering brief in excess of the type-volume limitation is granted. The clerk of this court shall detach the proposed answering brief, attached as Exhibit B to the motion, and shall file it separately. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file reply briefs, if deemed necessary. See NRAP 28(c). The stipulation to extend time to file the reply briefs is disapproved as moot. (SC)20-44386
12/07/2020BriefFiled Respondents Timothy Lee Bailey, Constance Marie Bailey, Fred Bailey, Carolyn Bailey's Answering Brief. (SC)20-44387
12/11/2020MotionFiled Reply in Support of Pacific Legal Foundation's Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae in Support of Respondents''. (SC)20-45110
12/23/2020BriefFiled DNRPCA Appellants' Reply Brief with Addendum. (SC)20-46376
12/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall detach the amicus brief from the motion filed on November 13, 2020, and shall file it separately. Attorney Daniel Ortner shall be permitted to appear on behalf of amicus in this matter. Nevada attorney Steven M. Silva of Blanchard, Krasner & French shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Ortner in this matter. fn1[The clerk of this court shall remove Tim Wilson from the service list, caption, and docket and shall substitute Adam Sullivan as the State Engineer on the service list, caption and the docket sheet.] (SC)20-46425
12/23/2020BriefFiled Pacific Legal Foundation's Amicus Brief. (SC)20-46430
12/30/2020BriefFiled Appellant State Engineer's Reply Brief. (SC)20-46930
12/30/2020BriefFiled Eureka County's Joinder to DNRPCA Appellants' Reply and Appellant State Engineer's Reply Brief. (SC)20-46935
12/31/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
12/31/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Change of Address for Christopher Mixson, new address and firm. (SC)20-47087
04/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on June 2, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC)21-09641
05/12/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellants' Joint Notice Regarding Oral Argument. (SC)21-13614
05/18/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-14261
05/18/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellants' DNRPCA Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (SC)21-14285
05/20/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Oral Argument. This matter is currently scheduled for oral argument on June 2, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas. Upon further review, we conclude that this matter warrants extending the time for argument. Accordingly, the oral argument is rescheduled for June 2, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 60 minutes. (SC)21-14597
06/02/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. 81224. (SC)
06/16/2022Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, C.J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Cadish/Herndon. Parraguirre, C.J., withi whom Silver, J., agrees, dissenting. Pickering, J., with whom Silver, J., agrees, dissenting. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 43. (SC)22-19127
07/01/2022Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents Ira R. Renner, Montira Renner, and Sadler Ranch, LLC's Petition for Rehearing due: July 19, 2022. (SC)22-20894
07/19/2022Filing FeeRehearing Filing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Sonia Taggart. E-Payment Ref. no. 22071925328751. (SC)
07/19/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondents Sadler Ranch, LLC, Ira Renner, and Montira Renner Petition for Rehearing. (SC)22-22710
07/29/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Answer due: 14 days. (SC)22-23883
08/03/2022Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants' Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: August 26, 2022. (SC)22-24358
08/24/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellants' Joint Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC)22-26463
09/12/2022Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Parraguirre, C.J., Silver, and Pickering, J.J, dissenting. (SC)22-28356
10/07/2022RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).22-31672
10/07/2022Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).