Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/05/2014 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | | |
06/05/2014 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 14-18354
|
06/05/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. | | 14-18359
|
06/05/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 14-18361
|
06/09/2014 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Pezzillo Lloyd. Check No. 9009. | | |
06/09/2014 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | | 14-18758
|
06/09/2014 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief: | | 14-18761
|
06/18/2014 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: Jan. 21-24, 2014 To Court Reporter: Kimberly Lawson. | | 14-20139
|
06/26/2014 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeal. | | 14-20975
|
07/11/2014 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Consolidate Case No. 65819 and Case no. 61715. | | 14-22617
|
07/24/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals and Order to Show Cause. Appellant: 30 days to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellants' response is served. The preparation of transcripts and the briefing schedule shall remain suspended in Docket No. 61715 and shall be suspended in Docket No. 65819 pending further order of this court. Nos. 6715/65819. | | 14-24100
|
08/25/2014 | Motion | Filed Cashman Equipment Company's Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 61715/65819. | | 14-28078
|
09/03/2014 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Reply to Cashman Equipment Company's Response to Order to Show Cause. | | 14-28968
|
09/30/2014 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Consolidate Case No. 66452 With Case No. 65819 and Case no. 61715. | | 14-32380
|
10/20/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals and Referring Appeals to Settlement Program. The clerk of this court shall consolidate Docket No. 66452 with Docket Nos. 61715 and 65819. We refer these appeals to the settlement program. The deadlines for preparing transcripts and briefing remain stayed pending further order of this court. Fn2[Appellant's October 1, 2014, motion for an extension of time to file the case appeal statement in Docket No. 66452 is approved. The clerk of this court shall detach from the motion and file appellant's case appeal statement. The clerk of this court shall remove the following respondents from the caption of these appeals: CAM Consulting, Inc., Angelo Carvalho, and Janel Rennie a/k/a Janel Carvalho.] | | 14-34913
|
10/20/2014 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement (Docket No. 66452). | | 14-34914
|
10/24/2014 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. Issued Amended Notice of Assignment to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. New Settlement Judge:
Ara H. Shirinian. | | 14-35601
|
11/10/2014 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 12/18/14 at 10:00. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 14-37042
|
01/27/2015 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-02870
|
01/28/2015 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days to fle a single opening brief and appendix. Appellant has failed to file the docketing statement in Docket No. 66452 when due. Docketing statement due: 10 days. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-03043
|
02/11/2015 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-04521
|
02/12/2015 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement - Civil Appeals. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-04656
|
04/13/2015 | Motion | Filed Stipulation To Extend Briefing Schedule (First Request). Nos. 61715/65819/66452 | | 15-10940
|
04/13/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 28, 2015. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-10957
|
05/08/2015 | Motion | Filed Stipulation To Dismiss Respondents Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America With Prejudice. | | 15-14085
|
05/18/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Dismissing Appeals. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, these consolidated appeals are dismissed as to respondents Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America only. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-15250
|
05/21/2015 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule (Second Request). Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-15670
|
05/29/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. We elect to treat the stipulation as a joint motion. for an extension of time, and we grant the motion. Opening Brief due: June 18, 2015. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-16449
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 1. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18469
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 2. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18471
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 3. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18474
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 4. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18503
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 5. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18507
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 6. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18515
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 7. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18516
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 8. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18520
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 9. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18521
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 10. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18523
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 11. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18524
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 12. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18530
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 13. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18532
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 14. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18533
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 15. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18534
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 16. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18535
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 17. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18536
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 18. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18537
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 19. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18538
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 20. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18539
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 21. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18540
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 22. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18541
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 23. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18542
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 24. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18543
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 25. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18544
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 26. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18545
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 27. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18546
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 28. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18547
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 29. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18548
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 30. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18549
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 31. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18550
|
06/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 32. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18551
|
06/18/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-18744
|
07/02/2015 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule for Respondents' Answering Brief (First Request). Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-20163
|
07/02/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: August 19, 2015. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-20168
|
08/19/2015 | Brief | Filed Respondents Answering Brief. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-25131
|
08/19/2015 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Appendix (Volume 33 of 33) (Pages 7843-7859). Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-25132
|
08/24/2015 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule (Reply Brief). Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-25626
|
08/24/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: October 19, 2015. | | 15-25632
|
09/24/2015 | Motion | Filed Appellant Cashman Equipment Company's Motion to Strike Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-28935
|
10/02/2015 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Opposition to Appellant Cashman Equipment Company's Motion to Strike Respondents' Answering Brief. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-29921
|
10/09/2015 | Motion | Filed Appellant Cashman Equipment Company's Reply In Support of Motion to Strike Respondents Answering Brief. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-30791
|
10/20/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant Cashman Equipment Company's Reply Brief. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-31886
|
10/20/2015 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
11/02/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. We deny the motion to strike. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 15-33260
|
02/02/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 16-03480
|
02/03/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, April 5, 2016, at 10:30 am for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 16-03669
|
03/21/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 61715/65819/66452 | | 16-08825
|
04/05/2016 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
09/29/2016 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded with instructions." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cherry; J. Majority: Cherry/Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. Fn1[The Honorable Nancy M. Saitta, Justice, having retired, this matter was decided by a six-justice court.]132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 69. EN BANC Nos. 61715/65819/66452 | | 16-30273
|
10/24/2016 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | 16-33212
|
10/24/2016 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 61715/65819/66452. | | |
11/18/2016 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 31, 2016. | | 16-33212
|
02/15/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter to Publishers regarding corrections on recently filed opinions. Nos. 68987/(61715/65819/66452)/66094/68434/(69611/70648)/(68523/68754/68770/68845)/(68949/68975)/69065/68033/69218 (Filed in Docket no. 68989, Document no. 17-05409) | | |