Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/22/2015 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | | |
10/22/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (Fast track notice issued to trial counsel.) | | 15-32211
|
10/22/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | | 15-32214
|
10/23/2015 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 15-32384
|
11/02/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. (Filed by counsel). (Second NOA). | | 15-33244
|
11/02/2015 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Recorder. Michelle Ramsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/4/15 and 10/20/15. | | 15-33365
|
11/09/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate Cases 69036 & 69121. | | 15-34130
|
11/19/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Amended) (Third NOA). | | 15-35361
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 1-1 | | 15-36438
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 2-1 | | 15-36439
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 3-1 | | 15-36440
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 4-1 | | 15-36441
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 5-1 | | 15-36442
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 6-1 | | 15-36443
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 7-1 | | 15-36444
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 8-1 | | 15-36445
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 9-1 | | 15-36446
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 10-1 | | 15-36447
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 11-1 | | 15-36448
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 12-1 | | 15-36451
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 13-1 | | 15-36452
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 14-1 | | 15-36453
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 15-1 | | 15-36454
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 16-1 | | 15-36455
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 17-1 | | 15-36456
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 18-1 | | 15-36457
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 19-1 | | 15-36458
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 20-1 | | 15-36459
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 21-1 | | 15-36461
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 22-1 | | 15-36462
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Appellant's Appendix Volume 23-1 | | 15-36463
|
12/01/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk of this court shall return the pro se documents received on November 20, 2015, unfiled. It appears from the documents submitted that appellant may wish to dismiss his counsel and proceed on appeal without counsel. If so, appellant may file a motion requesting that relief within 15 days of the date of this order. | | 15-36484
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 24-1. | | 15-36569
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 25-1. | | 15-36570
|
12/01/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 26-1. | | 15-36571
|
12/01/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time in which to File Fast Track Statement. | | 15-36572
|
12/03/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has submitted a motion for leave to file an opening brief and appendix. Appellant is represented by counsel in this appeal and thus not permitted to file the submitted documents in pro se. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall return the pro se documents received on December 1, 2015, unfiled. | | 15-36837
|
12/09/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement and appendix received via E-Flex on December 4, 2015. Fast Track Response due: 20 days. fn1[On December 8, 2015, this court entered an order dismissing the appeal in Docket No. 69121. Accordingly, appellant's motion to consolidate is denied as moot.] | | 15-37542
|
12/09/2015 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | | 15-37544
|
12/09/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Vol. 29 (Pages 5576-5639). | | 15-37546
|
12/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 27-1. | | 15-38505
|
12/17/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 28-1. | | 15-38506
|
12/28/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Mailing - Fast Track Statement served on Appellant Brian O'Keefe. | | 15-39702
|
12/29/2015 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: January 6, 2016. | | 15-39904
|
01/06/2016 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | | 16-00304
|
01/13/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion To Dismiss Counsel, Directing Transmission of Record on Appeal, And Regarding Pro Se Motions. Appellant has submitted a motion to dismiss his counsel. The clerk of this court shall remove Matthew Carling as counsel of record for appellant. Opening Brief due: 30 days. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. The clerk of this court shall file the pro se motions received on December 23 and 29, 2015. Mr. Carling filed a certificate in this court on December 28, 2015, certifying that a copy of the fast track statement was mailed to appellant on December 15, 2015. Accordingly, we take no action on the motion for a copy of the fast track statement. This court may only consider matters appearing in the record when considering this appeal. As indicated above, we have ordered the record on appeal, and decline to take judicial notice of any documents not included in that record at this time. The motion for judicial notice is denied. fn1[We direct the clerk to file the motion received on December 15, 2015.] | | 16-01111
|
01/13/2016 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to Dismiss Counsel on Appeal Pursuant to Order Filed December 3, 2015. | | 15-38154
|
01/13/2016 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion this Court for Copy of Fast Track Statement Filed December 9, 2015in which Attorney and Court Clerks will not Provide After Several Requests. | | 15-39436
|
01/13/2016 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to take Judicial Notice Pursuant N.R.S. 47.150(2) of Rules (9;15) of the U.S Supreme Court N.R.S. 47.140(8) Pertaining to Notice of Appearance and Waiver Filed by (Rule 18) Solicitor General of Nevada C. Wayne Howle. | | 15-39872
|
01/15/2016 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion for Leave of Court to File Pro-Se Fast Track Reply (NRAP 46(b)) Noting Fast Track Response was Filed Jan 06, 2016 (Disputed Facts With Legal Argument and Authorities) | | 16-01460
|
01/26/2016 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion; "Petition for Rehearing (Denial of Judicial Notice) 1/13/16" | | 16-02725
|
01/26/2016 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion for Leave to use Original Record Pursuant NRAP 24(c). | | 16-02727
|
01/27/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a pro se motion to file a reply to the fast track response. However, on January 13, 2016, this court entered an order granting appellant's motion to dismiss his counsel. That order gave appellant 30 days to file an opening brief. Accordingly, we deny the motion for leave to file a fast track reply. The clerk shall return, unfiled, the fast track reply received on January 15, 2016. Per our January 13 order, appellant shall have until February 12, 2016, to file and serve an opening brief that complies with the requirements of NRAP 32. | | 16-02809
|
02/09/2016 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 16-04286
|
02/09/2016 | Appendix | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Appendix. | | 16-04287
|
02/23/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Supplemental Authorities Pursuant NRAP 31(e) to 'Subject-Matter" Jurisdiction Point of Error, Fatal Variance in Information at time of Plea; Alternatively Courts Obligation to Consider, even on Appeal. | | 16-05774
|
02/24/2016 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volumes 1-28 (via FTP). | | 16-05855
|
02/24/2016 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. | | |
02/25/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed SEALED portion of the Record on Appeal: pages 324-333 PSI Report, 3485-3494 PSI Report, 2890-2894, 4763-4788 and 4809-4840 | | |
04/01/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration and Resolving Motion Regarding Record. We previously entered an order denying appellant's pro se motion to take judicial notice of docket sheet in another case. Appellant has now filed a pro se motion for reconsideration. We remain unconvinced that judicial notice is appropriate at this time. Appellant has also filed, in pro se, a motion for leave to use the original record. To the extent that appellant seeks to rely on the appendix filed by his previous counsel and on the record on appeal, the motion is granted. Any other relief requested in the motion is denied. | | 16-10268
|
04/07/2016 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to Clarify Appellant's Record Hereby Incorporating by Reference this Court's Subsequent Order Dated 01/27/16 Becoming Dispositive by Ordering Appellant to File and Serve (See NRAP 31(a)) His Opening Brief which Naturally Includes an Appendix (See NRAP 32(d)) to Underpin the Opening Brief both Accepted and Already Filed on 02/09/16 | | 16-10945
|
06/22/2016 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn2[We have considered the pro se document filed in this court on April 7, 2016, and conclude that no relief is warranted.] NNP16D-MD/MC/MG | | 16-19508
|
07/01/2016 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Rehearing Pursuant NRAP 40 (c)(2)(A) - 40 (c)(2)(B) of Order of Affirmance, June 22, 2016. | | 16-20637
|
07/07/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Supplemental Authority Pursuant NRAP Rule 31(e). | | 16-21171
|
07/27/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Supplemental Authority. | | 16-23261
|
07/29/2016 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion for NRCP 60(b) Relief of this Courts Affirmance Filed June 22, 2016 for Unfiling Proper Timely Notice of Appeal Seeking US Certiorari of Affirmance of Direct Appeal 61631 Thereby Issuing Remittitur Prematurely Which Started the Collateral Clock Before the US Supreme Court Finished Announcing Certiorari Denied 10/15/2013. | | 16-23658
|
08/01/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Proof of Service of Motion for NRCP 60(b) Relief. | | 16-23853
|
08/03/2016 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Supplemental Motion for NRCP Rule 60 (B) Relief Based on Due Process, Substantive Rights. | | 16-24101
|
08/22/2016 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document "NRCivP Rule 5 and 15; F.R.Civ.P Rule 5(d)(4) Filing for Judicial Notice, in the Alternative, "Substantial Justice" [Pursuant to N.R.S 47.150 (2) and SCOTUS S.C.R. 201(c)(2) as App. A-10]." | | 16-26084
|
08/22/2016 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document "Judicial Notice Appendix." (STRICKEN PER ORDER 9/1/16). | | |
09/01/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed, in pro se, a "Filing for Judicial Notice, In the Alternative, 'Substantial Justice.'" We elect to treat the document as a motion for judicial notice. No cause appearing, the motion is denied. The clerk shall strike the "Judicial Notice Appendix" filed on August 22, 2106. Although appellant's motion was filed, we remind appellant that motions are limited to 10 pages. The clerk shall return, unfiled, any future motions that exceed this limitation. | | 16-27205
|
09/12/2016 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Petition for Rehearing, NRAP 40, Order Denying Motions and Striking Appendix which Mandates Judicial Notice of 3rd Trial Jury Instructions Per "Shall" in NRS 47.150(2) as Defined Par Excellence in Goudge vs. State 287 P.3d 301, 304 (Nev. 2012).(Motion to Reconsider 09/01/16 Order). | | 16-28218
|
09/22/2016 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). | | 16-29447
|
09/26/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion in pro se titled "Petition for Rehearing, NRAP 40, Order denying Motions and Striking Appendix which Mandated Judicial Notice 3rd Trial Jury Instructions Per 'Shall' in NES 47.150(2) as Defined Par Excellence in Goudge vs. State 287 P.3d 301, 304 (Nev. 2012)." The substance of the motion requests reconsideration of this court's order entered September 1, 2016, denying appellant's motion for judicial notice. No good cause appearing, the motion is denied. | | 16-29855
|
09/30/2016 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to Stay Remittitur Pending U.S. Certiorari Review. | | 16-30569
|
10/12/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Staying Issuance of Remittitur. We hereby stay issuance of the remittitur until February 16, 2017. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by February 16, 2017, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by February 16, 2017, the remittitur shall issue forthwith. | | 16-31757
|
10/13/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed September 28, 2016 and placed on the docket as Case No. 16-6353. | | 16-31901
|
12/16/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. | | 16-39206
|
12/16/2016 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 16-39247
|
12/16/2016 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
01/03/2017 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 21, 2016. | | 16-39247
|