+
Party Information
|
Role | Party Name | Represented By |
Appellant | Ana Martinez | Nicholas A. Boylan
(Law Offices of Nicholas A. Boylan, APC)
Shawn Christopher
(Christopher Legal Group)
|
Appellant | Bijan Laghaei | Nicholas A. Boylan
(Law Offices of Nicholas A. Boylan, APC)
Shawn Christopher
(Christopher Legal Group)
|
Appellant | Camilo Martinez | Nicholas A. Boylan
(Law Offices of Nicholas A. Boylan, APC)
Shawn Christopher
(Christopher Legal Group)
|
Appellant | Donna Herrera | Nicholas A. Boylan
(Law Offices of Nicholas A. Boylan, APC)
Shawn Christopher
(Christopher Legal Group)
|
Appellant | Francine Sansota | Nicholas A. Boylan
(Law Offices of Nicholas A. Boylan, APC)
Shawn Christopher
(Christopher Legal Group)
|
Appellant | Frank Scinta | Nicholas A. Boylan
(Law Offices of Nicholas A. Boylan, APC)
Shawn Christopher
(Christopher Legal Group)
|
Appellant | Jacqueline Scinta | Nicholas A. Boylan
(Law Offices of Nicholas A. Boylan, APC)
Shawn Christopher
(Christopher Legal Group)
|
Appellant | James Nico | Nicholas A. Boylan
(Law Offices of Nicholas A. Boylan, APC)
Shawn Christopher
(Christopher Legal Group)
|
Appellant | Jeffrey Benko | Nicholas A. Boylan
(Law Offices of Nicholas A. Boylan, APC)
Shawn Christopher
(Christopher Legal Group)
|
Appellant | Jesse Hennigan | Nicholas A. Boylan
(Law Offices of Nicholas A. Boylan, APC)
Shawn Christopher
(Christopher Legal Group)
|
Appellant | Jesus Gomez | Nicholas A. Boylan
(Law Offices of Nicholas A. Boylan, APC)
Shawn Christopher
(Christopher Legal Group)
|
Appellant | Patricia Tagliamonte | Nicholas A. Boylan
(Law Offices of Nicholas A. Boylan, APC)
Shawn Christopher
(Christopher Legal Group)
|
Appellant | Raymond Sansota | Nicholas A. Boylan
(Law Offices of Nicholas A. Boylan, APC)
Shawn Christopher
(Christopher Legal Group)
|
Appellant | Robert Mandarich | Nicholas A. Boylan
(Law Offices of Nicholas A. Boylan, APC)
Shawn Christopher
(Christopher Legal Group)
|
Appellant | Sandra Kuhn | Nicholas A. Boylan
(Law Offices of Nicholas A. Boylan, APC)
Shawn Christopher
(Christopher Legal Group)
|
Appellant | Silvia Gomez | Nicholas A. Boylan
(Law Offices of Nicholas A. Boylan, APC)
Shawn Christopher
(Christopher Legal Group)
|
Appellant | Susan Hjorth | Nicholas A. Boylan
(Law Offices of Nicholas A. Boylan, APC)
Shawn Christopher
(Christopher Legal Group)
|
Appellant | Susan Kallen | Nicholas A. Boylan
(Law Offices of Nicholas A. Boylan, APC)
Shawn Christopher
(Christopher Legal Group)
|
Respondent | California Reconveyance Company | Kathryn E. Brown
(Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP/Phoenix)
Sarah B. Burwick
(Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP/Phoenix)
Kent F. Larsen
(Smith Larsen & Wixom)
Jessica R. Maziarz
(Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP/Phoenix)
Lawrence G. Scarborough
(Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP/Phoenix)
Katie M. Weber
(Smith Larsen & Wixom)
|
Respondent | Meridian Foreclosure Service | |
Respondent | Meridian Trust Deed Service | |
Respondent | MTC Financial, Inc. | Michael R. Brooks
(Kolesar & Leatham, Chtd.)
Allan E. Ceran
(Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP)
Richard J. Reynolds
(Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP)
|
Respondent | MTDS, Inc. | |
Respondent | National Default Servicing Corporation | Jason C. Kolbe
(Tiffany & Bosco, P.A./Las Vegas)
Kevin S. Soderstrom
(Tiffany & Bosco, P.A./Las Vegas)
Ace C. Van Patten
(Tiffany & Bosco, P.A./Las Vegas)
Gregory L. Wilde
(Tiffany & Bosco, P.A./Las Vegas)
|
Respondent | Quality Loan Service Corporation | Thomas Neal Beckom
(Eglet Adams)
Kristin A. Schuler-Hintz
(McCarthy & Holthus, LLP/Las Vegas)
|
Respondent | Trustee Corps | |
Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/18/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | | |
07/18/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 17-23843
|
07/18/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. | | 17-23847
|
07/18/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 17-23849
|
07/19/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. | | 17-23986
|
07/19/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Respondent California Reconveyance Company. (Lawrence G. Scarborough and Jessica R. Maziarz appearing as pro hac vice). | | 17-23997
|
07/20/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. | | 17-24164
|
07/21/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Respondent MTC Financial Inc. dba Trustee Corps. (Michael R. Brooks, Esq. of the law firm of Brooks Hubley, LLP, and Richard J. Reynolds, Esq. and Allan E. Ceran, Esq. of the law firm of Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP. appearing on behalf of Respondent MTC Financial, Inc. dba Trustee Corps.) | | 17-24187
|
07/21/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices of Nicholas A. Boylan. Check no. 7313. | | |
07/21/2017 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert F. Saint-Aubin. | | 17-24279
|
07/27/2017 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for: TBD. | | 17-25040
|
08/04/2017 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 17-25923
|
08/24/2017 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. Initial settlement conference: October 24, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Settlement statements due by email by October 17, 2017. | | 17-28463
|
09/26/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Attorney Contact Information (Kolesar & Leatham). | | 17-32545
|
11/01/2017 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 17-37390
|
11/03/2017 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 17-37698
|
11/17/2017 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 17-39712
|
01/11/2018 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time for Filing of Appellants' Opening Brief. | | 18-01658
|
01/11/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 5, 2018. | | 18-01660
|
02/28/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Type-Volume and Page Limitations. | | 18-07907
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1. | | 18-08176
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2. | | 18-08239
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3. | | 18-08189
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4. | | 18-08190
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5. | | 18-08192
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 6. | | 18-08193
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 7. | | 18-08195
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 8. | | 18-08202
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 9. | | 18-08211
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 10. | | 18-08215
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 11. | | 18-08216
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 12. | | 18-08219
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 13. | | 18-08220
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 14. | | 18-08221
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 15. | | 18-08222
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 16. | | 18-08224
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 17. | | 18-08225
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 18. | | 18-08226
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 19. | | 18-08227
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 20. | | 18-08228
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 21. | | 18-08229
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 22. | | 18-08232
|
03/01/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 23. | | 18-08233
|
03/05/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellants have filed a motion for leave to file an opening brief in excess of the type-volume limitation. The motion is denied. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the opening brief received on February 28, 2018. Opening Brief due: 15 days. | | 18-08550
|
03/08/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 18-09200
|
03/08/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Fact Summary as Part of the Appendix (Or as Directed by the Court). | | 18-09260
|
03/22/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. The clerk shall return, unfiled the supplemental fact summary received via E-Flex on March 8, 2018. | | 18-11164
|
03/27/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Notice to the Court Regarding Oral Argument. | | 18-11850
|
03/28/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Answering Briefs. | | 18-11998
|
03/28/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Respondents' Motion Approved. Answering Briefs due: May 9, 2018. | | 18-12015
|
04/25/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's California Reconveyance Company's Notice of Firm Name Change. | | 18-15855
|
05/09/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. | | 18-17651
|
05/09/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent California Reconveyance Company's Answering Brief. | | 18-17688
|
05/10/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume 1. | | 18-17730
|
05/10/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume 2. | | 18-17732
|
05/10/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume 3. | | 18-17734
|
05/10/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume 4. | | 18-17736
|
05/10/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume 5. | | 18-17737
|
05/10/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume 6. | | 18-17738
|
05/10/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume 7. | | 18-17739
|
05/10/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Volume 8. | | 18-17740
|
05/10/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent National Default Servicing Corporation's Answering Brief. | | 18-17797
|
05/10/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Substantive Joinder to the Answering Brief of California Reconveyance Company. | | 18-17805
|
05/10/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent MTC Financial Inc. DBA Trustee Corps' Answering Brief. | | 18-17872
|
05/23/2018 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time For Filing of Appellants' Reply Briefs. | | 18-19800
|
06/05/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellants shall have until July 13, 2018, to file and serve the reply briefs. | | 18-21199
|
07/11/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply to Respondent MTC Financial Inc. DBA Trustee Corps' Answering Brief. | | 18-26313
|
07/11/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief to Respondent Quality Loan Service Corporation's Substantive joinder to the Answering Brief of Respondent California Conveyance Company. | | 18-26319
|
07/11/2018 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
07/11/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief to the Answering Brief of Respondent California Reconveyance Company. | | 18-26475
|
07/11/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief to Respondent National Default Servicing Corporation's Answering Brief. | | 18-26481
|
04/09/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Joint Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC) | | 19-15489
|
08/05/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Thursday, September 5, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 19-32902
|
08/21/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice (SC). | | 19-35016
|
08/28/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Ace C. Van Patten for Respondent National Default Servicing Corporation). (SC) | | 19-35963
|
08/29/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Joint Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC) | | 19-36301
|
09/05/2019 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. (SC) | | |
12/26/2019 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Gibbons/Pickering/Parraguirre/Stiglich/Cadish/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 64 | | 19-52112
|
01/10/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellants' Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 20-01395
|
01/10/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Nicholas A. Boylan. (SC) | | |
02/21/2020 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC). | | 20-07110
|
03/17/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 20-10358
|
03/17/2020 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
04/22/2020 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 26, 2020. (SC) | | 20-10358
|