Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/01/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
11/01/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 19-44971
|
11/01/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 19-44974
|
11/04/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Simons Hall Johnston. Check no. 1169. (SC) | | |
11/05/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 19-45390
|
11/06/2019 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC). | | 19-45566
|
11/15/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance as Counsel for Respondents Peter Eliades, Individually and as Trustee of the Eliades Survivor Trust of 10/30/08; Teld, LLC; and Respondent/Cross-Appellant Eldorado Hills, LLC. (SC) | | 19-46885
|
11/15/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross-Appeal. (El Dorado Hills/Cross-Appellant) (SC) | | |
11/15/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Cross-Appellant El Dorado Hills) (SC) | | 19-46916
|
11/15/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Cross-Appellant El Dorado Hills) (SC) | | 19-46919
|
11/15/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross-Appeal. (Cross-Appellants Rogich) (SC) | | |
11/15/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Cross-Appellants Rogich) (SC) | | 19-46930
|
11/15/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Cross-Appellants Rogich) (SC) | | 19-46934
|
11/15/2019 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Brenoch R. Wirthlin. (Cross-Appellants Rogich)(SC) | | |
11/15/2019 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Joseph A. Liebman. (Cross-Appellant El Dorado Hills) (SC) | | |
11/20/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/01/18, 11/05/18 and 04/18/19. To Court Reporter: Brynn White. (SC) | | 19-47606
|
11/26/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant Nanyah Vegas, LLC's Docketing Statement due: December 10, 2019. (SC). | | 19-48252
|
11/26/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Cross-Appellant Eldorado Hills, LLC's Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 19-48417
|
11/26/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Cross-Appellant Eldorado Hills, LLC's Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested. (SC) | | 19-48421
|
11/27/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Cross-Appellants' Imitations, LLC and Sig Rogich's Docketing Statement due: December 20, 2019. (SC). | | 19-48538
|
12/10/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant Nanyah Vegas, LLC's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-50068
|
12/20/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Sigmund Rogich and Imitations, LLC's Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 19-51673
|
01/06/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellant and cross-appellants shall each have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal and the cross-appeals should not be dismissed, in whole or in part, for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents TELD, LLC, and Peter Eliades, individually and as trustee of the Eliades Survivor Trust of 10/30/08, may file any replies within 14 days of service of the last-filed response. Briefing of this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. (SC). | | 20-00602
|
02/04/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant Nanyah Vegas, LLC's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 20-04897
|
02/04/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Brenoch Wirthlin, Esq. of the law firm Kolesar & Leatham substituting as counsel for respondent/cross-appellants "Rogich Defendants," in place and stead of Fennemore Craig, P.C. (SC) | | 20-04913
|
02/05/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Eldorado Hills, LLC's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 20-05056
|
02/05/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Sig Rogich's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 20-05083
|
02/28/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address/Change of Law Firm (Brenoch R. Wirthlin is now associated with Hutchison & Steffen, PPLC). (SC) | | 20-08188
|
03/04/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Counsel (Brenoch R. Wirthlin of the law firm of Hutchison & Steffen in place of Kolesar & Leatham as counsel for Respondents Sigmund Roich and Trusteeof the Rogich Family Irrevocable Trust and Imitations LLC). (SC) | | 20-08659
|
03/16/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. The parties shall each have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why their appeals should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Any party may file a reply to the response filed by another party within 14 days of service of the response. Briefing of this matter remains suspended pending further order of this court. (SC). | | 20-10262
|
04/15/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant Nanyah Vegas, LLC's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 20-14376
|
04/15/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Eldorado Hills, LLC's Response to March 16, 2020 Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 20-14412
|
04/15/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross Appellant Rogich Parties' Response to Order to Show Cause Entered March 16, 2020. (SC) | | 20-14434
|
04/28/2020 | Motion | Filed Supplement to Appellant Nanyah Vegas, LLC's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC). | | 20-16067
|
07/17/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant Nanyah Vegas, LLC's Motion to Consolidate Appeals 79917, 81038 and 81238 and Extend Briefing Schedule Currently Set in 81328. (SC) | | 20-26297
|
07/21/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Consolidation. Nos. 79917/81038/81238. (SC). | | 20-26596
|
10/14/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Because respondent/cross-appellant Eldorado Hills, LLC in Docket No. 79917 has not carried its burden to establish jurisdiction, its cross-appeal is dismissed. The parties have filed a document entitled, "Stipulation for Consolidation," which we construe as a joint motion to consolidate Docket Nos. 79917, 81038, and 81238, and establish a consolidated briefing schedule. The motion is granted. Nanyah shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single opening brief addressing all issues raised in these consolidated appeals and an appendix. The Rogich parties shall have 30 days from service of Nanyah's opening brief to file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Eldorado, respondent Teld, LLC, and respondent Peter Eliades, individually and as trustee of the Eliades Survivor Trust of 10/30/08 (Eldorado), likewise shall have 30 days from service of Nanyah's opening brief to file and serve an answering brief to Nanyah's opening brief. Nanyah shall have 30 days from service of the Rogich parties' combined brief and the answering brief to file and serve a combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal, likewise Eldorado shall have 30 days from service of the Rogich parties' combined brief to file an answering brief on cross-appeal. Finally, the Rogich parties shall have 14 days from service of Nanyah's combined brief to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal, if deemed necessary. fn1[In light of this order, Nanyah's "Motion to Consolidate Appeals 79917, 81038 and 81238" filed on July 17, 2020, in Docket No. 79917 is denied as moot.] Nos. 79917/81038/81238. (SC) | | 20-37798
|
11/18/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 79917/81038/81238. (SC) | | 20-42158
|
11/30/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Nanyah Vegas, LLC shall have until March 11, 2021, to file and serve its opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with this court's October 14, 2020, order. Nos. 79917/81038/81238. (SC) | | 20-43264
|
02/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant (Nanyah Vegas, LLC) Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 79917/81038/81238. (SC) | | 21-05592
|
03/02/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Copy of Writ of Execution of Other Property. Nos. 79917/81038/81238. (SC). | | 21-06126
|
03/05/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Nanyah Vegas, LLC shall have until June 9, 2021, to file and serve its opening brief and appendix. Nos. 79917/81038/81238. (SC) | | 21-06471
|
03/29/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Bankruptcy Filing for Nanyah Vegas, LLC. (SC) | | 21-08988
|
04/07/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Nanyah Vegas, LLC, shall, within 21 days from the date of this order, show cause why the automatic stay is applicable to these appeals such that they should be dismissed without prejudice. The remaining parties shall have 14 days from service of Nanyah's response to file and serve replies. Briefing is suspended. Nos. 79917/81038/81238 (SC) | | 21-09953
|
04/26/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant Nanyah Vegas, LLC's Response to April 7, 2021 Order to Show Cause. Nos. 79917/81038/81238. (SC) | | 21-11962
|
05/10/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Rogich Parties' Reply to Nanyah Vegas, LLC's Response to April 7, 2021 Order to Show Cause. Nos. 79917/81038/81238. (SC) | | 21-13398
|
06/18/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Dismissing Appeals in Docket Nos. 81038 and 81238. "We dismiss the appeals in Docket Nos. 81038 and 81238." The appeal and cross-appeal in Docket No. 79917 shall proceed. Nanyah Vegas, LLC shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief on appeal and the appendix. SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC) | | 21-17568
|
07/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Opening Brief in Excess of 14,000 Words. (DETACHED OPENING BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER FILED 7/27/21). (SC) | | 21-19840
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-19842
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-19844
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-19845
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 4. (SC) | | 21-19847
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 5. (SC) | | 21-19850
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 6. (SC) | | 21-19851
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 7. (SC) | | 21-19852
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 8. (SC) | | 21-19854
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 9. (SC) | | 21-19855
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 10. (SC) | | 21-19856
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 11. (SC) | | 21-19857
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 12. (SC) | | 21-19858
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 13. (SC) | | 21-19859
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 14. (SC) | | 21-19861
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 15. (SC) | | 21-19862
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 16. (SC) | | 21-19863
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 17. (SC) | | 21-19864
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 18. (SC) | | 21-19866
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 19. (SC) | | 21-19867
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 20. (SC) | | 21-19868
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 21. (SC) | | 21-19869
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 22. (SC) | | 21-19870
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 23. (SC) | | 21-19871
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 24. (SC) | | 21-19872
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 25. (SC) | | 21-19873
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 26. (SC) | | 21-19874
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 27. (SC) | | 21-19875
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 28. (SC) | | 21-19876
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 29. (SC) | | 21-19877
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 30. (SC) | | 21-19878
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 31. (SC) | | 21-19879
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 32. (SC) | | 21-19880
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 33. (SC) | | 21-19881
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 34. (SC) | | 21-19882
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 35. (SC) | | 21-19883
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 36. (SC) | | 21-19884
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 37. (SC) | | 21-19885
|
07/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Vol. 38. (SC) | | 21-19886
|
07/27/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall detach the opening brief from the motion filed on July 9, 2021, and file it separately. Sig Rogich, individually and as trustee of the Rogich Family Irrevocable Trust, and Imitations, LLC (the Rogich parties) shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Eldorado Hills, LLC, Teld, LLC, and Peter Eliades, individually and as trustee of the Eliades Survivor Trust of 10/30/08 (Eldorado), likewise shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answering brief to Nanyah's opening brief. Nanyah shall have 30 days from service of the Rogich parties' combined brief or Eldorado's answering brief, whichever is last-filed, to file and serve a combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Eldorado shall have 30 days from service of the Rogich parties' combined brief to file an answering brief on cross-appeal. Finally, the Rogich parties shall have 14 days from service of Nanyah's combined brief or Eldorado's answering brief, whichever is last-filed, to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal, if deemed necessary. (SC) | | 21-21638
|
07/27/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-21641
|
08/10/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Joint Motion for Extension of Answering Brief Deadline (First Request). (SC) | | 21-23283
|
08/17/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Respondents' Joint Motion for Extension of Answering Brief Deadline. (SC) | | 21-24043
|
08/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Reply in Support of Their Joint Motion for Extension of Answering Brief Deadline (First Request). (SC) | | 21-24159
|
08/27/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Having considered the motion, opposition and reply, the motion is granted. The Rogich parties shall have until November 24, 2021, to file and serve their combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Eldorado shall have until November 24, 2021, to file and serve an answering brief to Nanyah's opening brief. (SC) | | 21-24964
|
11/24/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Teld, LLC, Peter Eliades, Individually and as Trustee for the Eliades Survivor Trust of 10/30/08, and Eldorado Hills, LLC's Motion to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation. (BRIEF DETACHED AND FILED SEPARATELY PER 12/2/21 ORDER). (SC) | | 21-33827
|
11/24/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross Appellant Rogich Parties' Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (STRICKEN PER 12/2/21 ORDER). (SC) | | |
12/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The motion of respondents Teld, LLC, Peter Eliades, Individually and as Trustee of the Eliadas Survivor Trust of 10/30/08, and Eldorado Hills, LLC to exceed the type-volume limitation of NRAP 32(a)(7)(A)(ii) is granted. NRAP 32(a)(7)(D). The clerk shall detach the answering brief and the appendix from the motion filed on November 24, 2021, and file them separately. The clerk shall strike the Rogich parties' brief filed on November 24, 2021. The Rogich parties shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a corrected combined brief. (SC) | | 21-34374
|
12/02/2021 | Brief | Filed Teld, LLC, Peter Eliades, Individually and as Trustee for the Eliades Survivor Trust of 10/30/08, and Eldorado Hills, LLC's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-34378
|
12/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Teld, LLC, Peter Eliades, Individually and as Trustee for the Eliades Survivor Trust of 10/30/08, and Eldorado Hills, LLC's Appendix to Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-34381
|
12/09/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross Appellant Rogich Parties' Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 21-35139
|
12/14/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. (SC) | | 21-35585
|
01/07/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondents Teld, LLC, Peter Eliades, individually and as Trustee of The Eliades Survivor Trust of 10/30/08, and Eldorado Hills, LLC's Answering Brief to Rogich Parties' Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 22-00703
|
01/10/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitation. (BRIEF DETACHED AND RETURNED UNFILED PER 1/28/22 ORDER). (SC) | | 22-00976
|
01/18/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross Appellant Rogich Parties' Response to Nanyah's Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitation. (SC) | | 22-01800
|
01/20/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitation. (SC) | | 22-02092
|
01/28/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Nanyah Vegas, LLC has filed a motion for leave to file a combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal in excess of the type-volume limitation. The motion is granted. However, the combined brief attached to the motion cites to an attached addendum consisting of a copy of a district court order. A district court order is appropriately placed in an appendix, not an addendum. The clerk shall detach the combined brief from the motion filed on January 10, 2022, and return it unfiled. Nanyah Vegas, LLC shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file a combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal that is substantively identical to the brief attached to the January 10, 2022, motion except that the reference and citation to the addendum is modified or deleted, as deemed warranted. Within that same time period, Nanyah Vegas, LLC may file a supplemental appendix containing the district court order, if appropriate. (SC) | | 22-03030
|
02/01/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant Nanyah Vegas, LLC's Reply Brief & Answering Brief to Cross Appeal. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 2/1/22) (Inadvertently rejected on 2/1/22) (SC) | | |
02/01/2022 | Appendix | Filed Supplemental Appendix. (SC) | | 22-03335
|
02/01/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (Notice issued in error.) (SC) | | |
02/01/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant Nanyah Vegas, LLC's Reply Brief & Answering Brief to Cross Appeal. (SC) | | 22-03434
|
02/11/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents Imitations, LLC, Sig Rogich, and The Rogich Family Irrevocable Trust shall have until March 1, 2022, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC) | | 22-04747
|
02/17/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Stay. (SC) | | 22-05350
|
02/24/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents represented by Bailey Kennedy shall have until March 10, 2022 to file and serve their response to appellant's motion for stay. (SC) | | 22-06045
|
02/25/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents represented by Hutchison & Steffan LLC shall have until March 10, 2022 to file and serve their response to appellant's motion for stay. (SC) | | 22-06160
|
03/01/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross Appellant Rogich Parties' Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 22-06631
|
03/02/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
03/10/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent Teld, LLC, Peter Eliades, Individually and as Trustee for The Eliades Survivor Trust of 10/30/08, and Eldorado Hills, LLC's Opposition to Nanyah Vegas, LLC's Motion to Stay Enforcement During Pendency. (SC) | | 22-07722
|
03/10/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondents' (Rogich Parties') Opposition to Motion to Stay Enforcement During Pendency of Appeal. (SC) | | 22-07766
|
03/11/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata to Rogich Parties Opposition to Motion to Stay Enforcement During Pendency of Appeal. (SC) | | 22-07909
|
03/16/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply to Response to Motion to Stay Enforcement During Pendency of Appeal. (SC) | | 22-08433
|
04/05/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(E). (SC) | | 22-10631
|
04/11/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Stay. Appellant/cross-respondent, Nanyah Vegas, LLC, filed a motion for a stay of execution of any of the judgment pending this court's resolution of the issues on appeal. The motion for a stay of the sheriff's sale and execution of the judgment without posting a bond is denied. Nanyah's request to use its appellate claims as alternative security is denied. Nanyah may secure a stay by posting an adequate supersedeas bond. (SC) | | 22-11430
|
04/21/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Substitute Teld, LLC , Peter Eliades, Individually and as Trustee for The Eliades Survivor Trust of 10/30/08, and Eldorado Hills, LLC as Appellants and to Dismiss the Entire Appeal. (SC) | | 22-12680
|
05/13/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal and cross-appeal DISMISSED." | | 22-15282
|
06/07/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-18073
|
06/07/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
06/24/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 8, 2022. (SC) | | 22-18073
|