Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80615
Short Caption:PANORAMA TOWERS CONDO. UNIT OWNERS' ASS'N VS. HALLIERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A744146Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:SilverCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice SilverPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:03/02/2020 / Turner, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/14/2021How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/19/2020Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC)
02/19/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-06854
02/19/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)20-06863
02/21/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Kemp, Jones & Coulthard. Check no. 75355. (SC)
03/02/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William C. Turner. (SC)20-08238
03/11/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-09739
03/30/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for: TBD.20-12142
04/15/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC)20-14372
04/22/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).20-15220
05/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Transcript Request Form. Transcripts Requested: 01/24/17, 06/20/17, 08/01/17, 11/21/17, 03/15/18, 10/02/18, 02/12/19, 04/23/19, 07/16/19, 08/06/19, 10/17/19. To Court Reporter: Norma Ramirez. (SC).20-17114
07/21/2020MotionFiled Appellant's First Motion For Extension To File Opening Brief. (SC).20-26556
08/04/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Transcripts. Court recorder Norma Ramirez' Certificate of Delivery of Transcript of Proceedings due: 14 days. (SC)20-28428
08/05/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until September 21, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-28723
08/19/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Norma Ramirez stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/24/17, 06/20/17, 08/01/17, 11/21/17, 03/15/18, 10/02/18, 02/12/19, 07/16/19, 08/06/19. (SC)20-30614
08/21/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Norma Ramirez stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/24/17, 06/20/17, 08/01/17, 11/21/17, 03/15/18, 02/12/19, 07/16/19, 08/06/19. (SC)20-30930
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 1 of 27. (SC)20-34725
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 2 of 27. (SC)20-34726
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 3 of 27. (SC)20-34727
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 4 of 27. (SC)20-34728
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 5 of 27. (SC)20-34729
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 6 of 27. (SC)20-34730
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 7 of 27. (SC)20-34731
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 8 of 27. (SC)20-34732
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 9 of 27. (SC)20-34733
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 10 of 27. (SC)20-34735
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 11 of 27. (SC)20-34736
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 12 of 27. (SC)20-34737
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 13 of 27. (SC)20-34738
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 14 of 27. (SC)20-34739
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 15 of 27. (SC)20-34740
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 16 of 27. (SC)20-34741
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 19 of 27. (SC)20-34742
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 18 of 27. (SC)20-34743
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 17 of 27. (SC)20-34744
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 20 of 27. (SC)20-34745
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 21 of 27. (SC)20-34746
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 23 of 27. (SC)20-34747
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 22 of 27. (SC)20-34765
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 24 of 27. (SC)20-34748
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 25 of 27. (SC)20-34749
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 27 of 27. (SC)20-34750
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 26 of 27. (SC)20-34751
09/21/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-34760
10/02/2020MotionFiled Motion For Stay Of District Court Proceedings Pending Outcome Of This Appeal. (SC)20-36350
10/12/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Response to Appellant's Motion for Stay due: October 23, 2020. (SC)20-37329
10/21/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion for Extension to File Answering Brief. (SC)20-38681
10/23/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Opposition to Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings Pending Outcome of this Appeal. (SC)20-39033
10/26/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: November 23, 2020. (SC)20-39174
10/29/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply in support of appellant's motion due: November 16, 2020. (SC)20-39684
11/16/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings Pending Outcome of this Appeal. (SC).20-41712
11/16/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Supplemental Authority Regarding Motion to Stay. (SC).20-41743
11/20/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to stay the district court proceedings pending resolution of this appeal. The motion is denied. (SC)20-42419
11/20/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion for Extension to File Answering Brief. (SC)20-42545
11/30/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents shall have until January 25, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-43250
01/25/2021MotionFiled Respondents' Motion for Extension to File Answering Brief. (SC)21-02324
02/05/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: February 24, 2021. (SC)21-03611
02/24/2021MotionFiled Respondents' Motion for Extension to File Answering Brief. (SC)21-05523
03/05/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondents have filed a motion for a fourth extension of time to file the answering brief. The motion is denied. Respondents shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)21-06468
03/12/2021BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)21-07339
04/19/2021MotionFiled Appellant's First Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief. (SC)21-11312
04/21/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's reply brief due: May 12, 2021. (SC)21-11539
05/12/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-13697
05/13/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
09/01/2021OtherJustice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal
09/14/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the en banc court as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. (SC)21-26627
11/10/2021Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Vacated and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Herndon, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich/Cadish/Pickering/Herndon. fn1 [The Honorable Abbi Silver, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 67. En Banc. (SC).21-32275
11/29/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-34014
12/06/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-34691
12/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents shall have until December 29, 2021, to file and serve a petition for rehearing. If no petition is filed within this time period, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC)21-35347
12/29/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-37152
01/05/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Rehearing. (SC)22-00428
01/07/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents shall have until January 28, 2022, to file and serve a petition for rehearing. If no petition is filed within this time period, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC)22-00769
01/28/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)22-03044
01/28/2022Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Abraham G. Smith. (SC)
02/10/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Answer due: 14 days. (SC)22-04535
02/18/2022MotionFiled Stipulation For Extension Of Time To File Appellant's Answer To Respondents' Petition For Rehearing. (SC)22-05577
02/24/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant shall have until March 28, 2022, to file and serve the answer to the petition for rehearing. (SC)22-06121
03/28/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Response to Petition for Rehearing. (SC)22-09625
03/30/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance for Eva Segerblom and Ardea Canepa-Rotoli for Nevada Justice Association Proposed Amici. (SC)22-09958
03/30/2022MotionFiled Nevada Justice Association's Motion to Extend Time to File Brief of Amicus Curiae and Amicus Brief in Support of Appellant's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC)22-09959
04/08/2022MotionFiled Motion by the Nevada Justice Association for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Appellant's Response to Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)22-11167
05/18/2022Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[Nevada Justice Association's motions filed on March 30, 2022, and April 8, 2022, regarding the filing of an amicus curiae brief are denied.] fn2[The Honorable Abbi Silver, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] (SC)22-15758
06/13/2022RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)22-18711
06/13/2022Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/24/2022RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 15, 2022. (SC)22-18711