Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/20/2012 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. State/County/Municipality. | | |
07/20/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (Eureka Co.) | | 12-22979
|
07/20/2012 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Schroeder Law Offices, P.C. Check no. 21885. (Benson, Diamond Cattle, and Etcheverry) | | |
07/20/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (Benson, Diamond Cattle, and Etcheverry) | | 12-22987
|
07/20/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 12-22993
|
07/20/2012 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 4/3/12. Court Reporter: Lisa M. Manley. (Submitted by the District Court Clerk with the NOA). | | |
07/26/2012 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: William E. Nork. | | 12-23567
|
07/30/2012 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter with page 47 of the document Finding of Fact, Conclusions of Law, And Order Denying Petitions for Judicial Review attached. | | 12-23926
|
08/09/2012 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant Eureka County's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 12-25163
|
08/10/2012 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants' Kenneth F. Benson. Diamond Cattle Company, LLC amd Michel and Margaret Ann Etcheverry Family, LP Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 12-25168
|
08/15/2012 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 29, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. | | 12-25614
|
08/16/2012 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 17, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. | | 12-25862
|
08/17/2012 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Docketing Statement. | | 12-25968
|
09/20/2012 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 12-29810
|
09/27/2012 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 12-30646
|
10/09/2012 | Transcript Request | Filed Request Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested. | | 12-31980
|
10/11/2012 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 12-32351
|
12/27/2012 | Brief | Filed Appellant Eureka County's Opening Brief. | | 12-40828
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 1. | | 12-40831
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 2. | | 12-40832
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 3. | | 12-40833
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 4. | | 12-40834
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 5. | | 12-40835
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 6. | | 12-40836
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 7, Part 1. | | 12-40837
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 7, part 2 | | 12-40838
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 8. | | 12-40839
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 9, Part 1. | | 12-40840
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 9, part 2 | | 12-40841
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 10, Part 1. | | 12-40842
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 10, part 2. | | 12-40843
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 10, part 3. | | 12-40844
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 10, part 4. | | 12-40849
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 10, part 5. | | 12-40850
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 10, part 6. | | 12-40851
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 10, part 7 | | 12-40852
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 11, Part 1. | | 12-40853
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 11, part 2. | | 12-40860
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 11, part 3. | | 12-40862
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 11, part 4. | | 12-40863
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 12, Part 1. | | 12-40864
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 12, part 2. | | 12-40865
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 12, part 3. | | 12-40866
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 13. | | 12-40867
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 14. | | 12-40868
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 15. | | 12-40869
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 16. | | 12-40870
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 16, part 2. | | 12-40871
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 17. | | 12-40872
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 17, part 2. | | 12-40873
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 18. | | 12-40904
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 18, part 6 | | 12-40905
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 18, part 9 | | 12-40906
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 19 | | 12-40907
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 19, part 6 | | 12-40908
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 20 | | 12-40909
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 20, part 4 | | 12-40910
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 2 | | 12-40911
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 21, part 4 | | 12-40912
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 21, part 7 | | 12-40913
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 22 | | 12-40914
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 23 | | 12-40915
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 24 | | 12-40916
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 24, parts 2-4 | | 12-40917
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 24, parts 5-8 | | 12-40918
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 24, part 9 | | 12-40919
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 25, parts 1-3 | | 12-40920
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 25, part 4 | | 12-40921
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 26, parts 1-3 | | 12-40922
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 26, parts 4-6 | | 12-40923
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 27 | | 12-40924
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 28 | | 12-40962
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 29 | | 12-40964
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 30 | | 12-40965
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 30, parts 4-5/ | | 12-40966
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 31. | | 12-40967
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 32. | | 12-40968
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix, Volume 33. | | 12-40977
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 34, parts 1-3 | | 12-40978
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 34, parts 4-5 | | 12-40980
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 35 | | 12-40981
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Joint Appendix, Volume 36 | | 12-40982
|
12/27/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service Appellant Eureka County's Corrected Certificate of Service | | 12-40983
|
12/27/2012 | Brief | Filed Appellants Kenneth F. Benson, Diamond Cattle Company LLC, and Michael and Margaret Ann Etcheverry Family, LP's Opening Brief. | | 12-40976
|
12/27/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appellants Kenneth F. Benson, Diamond Cattle Company LLC, and Michael and Margaret Ann Etcheverry Family, LP's Supplement to Joint Appendix. | | 12-40861
|
12/27/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Summary of Appellants Kenneth F. Benson, Diamond Cattle Company LLC, and Michel and Margaret Ann Etcheverry Family LP's Supplement to Joint Appendix. | | 12-40975
|
01/22/2013 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. State of Nevada Division of Water Resources Answering Brief due: February 4, 2013. | | 13-02243
|
01/25/2013 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent Kobeh Valley Ranch, LLC, Answering Brief due: February 4, 2013. | | 13-02738
|
02/04/2013 | Brief | Filed State Engineer's Answering Brief. | | 13-03604
|
02/05/2013 | Brief | Filed Respondent Kobeh Valley Ranch's Answering Brief. | | 13-03651
|
02/05/2013 | Appendix | Filed Respondent Kobeh Valley Ranch's Appendix. | | 13-03653
|
02/05/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit of Service by Mail. (Answering Brief) | | 13-03720
|
02/13/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae NV Energy. | | 13-04741
|
02/14/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed The Nevada Mining Association's Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae and to Join in the Brief of the Municipal Water Purveyors. | | 13-04767
|
02/14/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Filing of Amicus Curiae Brief of Municipal Water Purveyors. | | 13-04768
|
02/25/2013 | Motion | Filed Eureka County's Response to Motions Filed Regarding Amicus Curiae Briefs; Eureka County's Motion for Permission to File Response to Briefs. | | 13-05833
|
02/26/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Response to Amici Briefs of Appellants Michel and Margaret Ann Etcheverry Family LP, Diamond Cattle Company LLC, and Kenneth F. Benson. | | 13-05904
|
03/01/2013 | Motion | Filed Stipulation For Extension Of Time For Appellants To File Reply Briefs. | | 13-06413
|
03/01/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: April 05, 2013. | | 13-06427
|
03/25/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Briefs and Granting Motions for Leave to File Responses to Amicus Curiae Briefs. The clerk of this court is directed to file the amicus curiae brief submitted by the Municipal Water Purveyors and received in this court on February 14, 2013. The clerk of this court shall file NV Energy's amicus curiae brief, which was provisionally received in this court on February 14, 2013. Appellants: Responses to the amicus curiae briefs due: 30 days. | | 13-08784
|
03/25/2013 | Brief | Filed Amici Curiae Brief of Municipal Water Purveyors in Support of Respondent Nevada State Engineer. | | 13-08786
|
03/25/2013 | Brief | Filed Brief of Amicus Curiae NV Energy. | | 13-08787
|
03/26/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys (Paul G. Taggart in place and stead of Brandi L. Jensen). | | 13-08915
|
04/05/2013 | Motion | Filed Eureka County's Motion to File Reply Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitation. | | 13-10029
|
04/05/2013 | Appendix | Filed Eureka County's Reply Appendix. | | 13-10032
|
04/05/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Declaration of Karen A. Peterson, Esq., and Certification Pursuant to NRAP 32(a)(7)(C). | | 13-10031
|
04/08/2013 | Brief | Filed Appellants Kenneth F. Benson's, Diamond Cattle Company LLC's and Michel and Margaret Ann Etcheverry Family LP's Reply Brief. | | 13-10116
|
04/11/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Oversized Reply Brief. The clerk of this court shall file the proposed reply brief, provisionally received in this court on April 5, 2013. | | 13-10733
|
04/11/2013 | Brief | Filed Eureka County's Reply Brief to Respondents' Answering Briefs. | | 13-10734
|
04/24/2013 | Brief | Filed Brief Appellant Eureka County's Response to Amici Curiae Briefs. | | 13-12070
|
04/24/2013 | Brief | Filed Appellants Kenneth F. Benson, Diamond Cattle Company LLC, and Michel and Margaret Ann Etcheverry Family LP's Answering Brief to Amici Curiae Briefs. | | 13-12090
|
04/24/2013 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
05/22/2013 | Motion | Filed Appellants Kenneth F. Benson, Diamond Cattle Company LLC, and Michel and Margaret Ann Etcheverry Family LP's Motion to Consolidate. | | 13-15050
|
05/22/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit of Therese A. Ure in Support of Appellants Kenneth F. Benson, Diamond Cattle Company LLC, and Michel and Margaret Ann Etcheverry Family LP's Motion to Consolidate. | | 13-15051
|
05/23/2013 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Appellants Kenneth F. Benson, Diamond Cattle Company, LLC, and Michel and Margaret Ann Etcheverry Family, LP's Motion to Consolidate. | | 13-15298
|
05/24/2013 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Motion to Consolidate. | | 13-15333
|
05/30/2013 | Motion | Filed Appellants Kenneth F. Benson, Diamond Cattle Company LLC, and Michel and Margaret Ann Etcheverry Family LP's Joint Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate. | | 13-16007
|
06/26/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Consolidate Appeals. We hereby consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. In light of the consolidation, we modify the briefing schedule in Docket No. 63258 as follows. Appellants in Docket No. 63258: 30 days to file and serve its opening brief and any supplemental appendix. Briefing thereafter shall proceed pursuant to NRAP 31(a)(1). Nos. 61324/63258. | | 13-18754
|
07/23/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorney, Deputy Attorney General Cassandra P. Joseph in place of Senior Deputy Attorney Generals, Bryan L. Stockton and Carolyn E. Tanner, for the State Engineer. Nos. 61324/63258. | | 13-21634
|
07/29/2013 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. Nos. 63258/61324. | | 13-22219
|
07/29/2013 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 1. Nos. 63258/61324. | | 13-22220
|
07/29/2013 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 2. Nos. 63258/61324. | | 13-22222
|
07/29/2013 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 3. Nos. 63258/61324. | | 13-22223
|
07/29/2013 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 4. Nos. 63258/61324. | | 13-22224
|
07/29/2013 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 5. Nos. 63258/61324. | | 13-22225
|
07/29/2013 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 6. Nos. 63258/61324. | | 13-22226
|
07/29/2013 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 7. Nos. 63258/61324. | | 13-22227
|
07/29/2013 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 8. Nos. 63258/61324. | | 13-22228
|
08/22/2013 | Brief | Filed Respondent Kobeh Valley Ranch, LLC's Answering Brief. Nos. 63258/61324. | | 13-24793
|
08/26/2013 | Brief | Filed Respondent State Engineer's Answering Brief. Nos. 63258/61324. | | 13-25235
|
09/23/2013 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (Michel and Margaret Ann Etcheverry Family, LLP; Diamond Cattle Company, LLC; and Kenneth F. Benson) Nos. 63258/61324 | | 13-28245
|
02/21/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Re: Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 61324/63258. | | 14-05828
|
02/27/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Tuesday, May 6, 2014, at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Nos. 61324/63258. | | 14-06548
|
03/05/2014 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Continue Oral Argument. | | 14-07150
|
03/05/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit of Laura A. Schroeder in Support of Motion to Continue Oral Argument. | | 14-07151
|
03/11/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The oral argument presently scheduled for May 6, 2014, at 11:30 a.m. is hereby vacated. The clerk of this court shall schedule this appeal for oral argument on the next available calendar. NOs. 61324/63258 | | 14-07873
|
03/12/2014 | Motion | Filed Response to Appellants' Motion to Continue Oral Argument. Nos. 61324/63258. | | 14-07938
|
04/23/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Monday, June 30, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 60 minutes. Nos. 61324/63258. | | 14-13099
|
04/29/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Philip R. Byrnes - Las Vegas City Attorney appearing as counsel for Amicus Curiae City of Las Vegas - Municipal Water Purveyors, in the place and stead of James W. Erbeck of the same office. Nos. 61324/63258. | | 14-13874
|
06/18/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 14-20065
|
06/30/2014 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
09/18/2015 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "REVERSE AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." EN BANC No. 61324/63258. | | 15-28315
|
09/28/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion to Reissue Order as a Published Opinion. Nos. 61324/63258. | | 15-29348
|
10/02/2015 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Reissue Order as a Published Opinion Pursuant to NRAP 36(f). Nos. 61324/63258. | | 15-29902
|
10/02/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Joinder of White Pine County, et al., to Motion to Reissue Order as a Published Opinion. Nos. 61324/63258. | | 15-29917
|
10/13/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Attorney (Micheline Fairbank to Replace Cassandra Joseph as counsel for Respondents' The State of Nevada Division of Water Resources and The State of Nevada State Engineer). Nos. 61324/63258. | | 15-31159
|
10/29/2015 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Fn1[We originally reversed and remanded in an unpublished order. We grant the motions and publish this opinion in place of our earlier order.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 84. EN BANC Nos. 61324/63258 | | 15-33016
|
11/23/2015 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 15-35801
|
11/23/2015 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
01/12/2016 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 25, 2015. | | 15-35801
|
02/10/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter dated February 8, 2016, to publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 62059/(61103/61640)/62745/63737/64881/65273/64214/61131/(60673/61390)/62061/64130/64484/65064/65632/66346/59685/(61305/61871)/(61324/63258)/65335/54389/64569 (Letter entered in 62059 as document no. 16-04455.) | | |
03/08/2016 | Remittitur | Issued Corrected Remittitur. Nos. 61324/63258 | | 16-07444
|
03/18/2016 | Remittitur | Filed Corrected Remittitur. Nos. 61324/63258 Received by County Clerk on March 10, 2016. | | 16-07444
|