Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/02/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Roger P. Croteau & Associates. Check no. 22551. (SC) | | |
12/02/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 19-48647
|
12/02/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 19-48649
|
12/03/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Ariel E. Stern, Melanie D. Morgan and Scott R. Lachman of Akerman LLP, as counsel for Respondent Thornburg Mortgage Securities Trust 2007-3. (SC) | | 19-48961
|
12/03/2019 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick N. Chapin. (SC). | | 19-48969
|
12/05/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Bryan Naddafi and Elena Nutenko of Avalon Legal Group LLC as co-counsel for Frank Timpa, Madelaine Timpa, and Timpa Trust). (SC) | | 19-49332
|
12/23/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-51933
|
12/23/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (Exhibits). (SC) | | 19-51936
|
01/09/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for Friday, April 17, 2020, at 9:30 AM. (SC) | | 20-01165
|
03/04/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Disassociation (Thera A. Cooper is no longer associated with the law firm of Akerman LLP). (SC) | | 20-08735
|
04/03/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 28, 2020, at 9:30 AM. (SC) | | 20-12770
|
05/11/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 30, 2020, at 9:30 AM. (SC) | | 20-17738
|
05/12/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent Spanish Trail Master Association's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC). | | 20-18075
|
05/18/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Chet Glover as counsel for the Appellant). (SC). | | 20-18852
|
05/18/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Chris Brenner as counsel for Appellant). (SC). | | 20-18856
|
05/19/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Respondent Spanish Trail Master Association's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 20-18995
|
05/19/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent Red Rock Financial Services' Joinder to Respondent Spanish Trail Master Association's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 20-19034
|
05/26/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent Spanish Trail Master Association's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC). | | 20-19877
|
06/02/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondent Spanish Trail Master Association has filed a motion requesting this court to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent Red Rock Financial Services, LLC, has filed a joinder to the motion. Appellant has opposed the motion. We deny the motion. This denial is without prejudice to respondents' right to renew the motion, if necessary, upon completion of settlement. (SC) | | 20-20692
|
06/03/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The settlement judge shall file the Final Settlement Program Status Report by July 1, 2020. (SC). | | 20-20884
|
06/30/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC). | | 20-24258
|
07/10/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-25533
|
07/16/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent Thornburg Mortgage Securities Trust 2007-3'S Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 20-26221
|
07/21/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opposition to Thornburg Mortgage Securities Trust 2007-3's Motion to Dismiss due: August 8, 2020. (SC). | | 20-26601
|
07/22/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Transcript Request Form due: August 7, 2020. (SC) | | 20-26748
|
07/31/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/03/18, 11/06/18, 06/11/19, 08/06/19, 08/13/19, 10/10/19, 10/29/19 and 12/17/19. To Court Reporter: Kerry Esparza. (SC) | | 20-27926
|
08/03/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation Regarding Survival of the Deed of Trust and Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 20-28262
|
08/12/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant and respondent Thornburg Mortgage Securities Trust 2007-3 have filed a stipulation to withdraw Thornburg's motion to dismiss filed on July 16, 2020. The stipulation is approved. This court will take no action in regard to Thornburg's motion to dismiss. (SC) | | 20-29705
|
09/04/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Disassociation (Chet A. Glover is no longer associated with the law firm of Roger P. Croteau & Associates, Ltd.). (SC) | | 20-32822
|
09/24/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent Spanish Trail Master Association's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 20-35272
|
09/29/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent Red Rock Financial Services' Joinder to Respondent Spanish Trail Master Association's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 20-35708
|
09/29/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Renewed Motion to Dismiss Appeal (First Request). (SC) | | 20-35792
|
10/01/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The stipulation for an extension of time for appellant to file a response to the motion to dismiss is approved. NRAP 26(b)(2). Appellant's response to the motion to dismiss due: October 15, 2020. (SC) | | 20-36079
|
10/08/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 20-37045
|
10/09/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until November 23, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-37102
|
10/12/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/03/18. (SC) | | 20-37412
|
10/15/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Respondent Spanish Trail Master Association's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 20-37979
|
10/19/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/03/18, 11/06/18, 06/11/19, 08/06/19, 08/13/19, 10/10/19, 10/29/19 and 12/17/19. (SC) | | 20-38256
|
10/22/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation Extending Time 30 Days for Filing Respondent Spanish Trail Master Association's Reply in Support of Renewed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 20-38791
|
10/26/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Respondent Spanish Trail shall have until November 23, 2020, to file and serve a reply. (SC) | | 20-39170
|
11/20/2020 | Motion | Filed Second Stipulation Extending Time for Filing Respondent Spanish Trail Master Association's Reply in Support of Renewed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 20-42525
|
11/23/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 1. (SC) | | 20-42663
|
11/23/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 2. (SC) | | 20-42664
|
11/23/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 3. (SC) | | 20-42666
|
11/23/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 4. (SC) | | 20-42667
|
11/23/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 5. (SC) | | 20-42669
|
11/23/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 6. (SC) | | 20-42670
|
11/23/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 7. (SC) | | 20-42672
|
11/23/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 8. (SC) | | 20-42674
|
11/23/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 9. (SC) | | 20-42675
|
11/23/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 10. (SC) | | 20-42676
|
11/23/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 11. (SC) | | 20-42677
|
11/23/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 13. (SC) | | 20-42678
|
11/23/2020 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 12. (SC) | | 20-42679
|
11/23/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 20-42710
|
11/24/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Spanish Trail Master Association have until December 7, 2020, to file and serve a reply. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is denied as moot. (SC) | | 20-42843
|
12/07/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent Spanish Trail Master Association's Reply in Support of Renewed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 20-44270
|
12/16/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Renewed Motion to Dismiss and Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's opening brief due: 30 days. (SC) | | 20-45491
|
01/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Third Request). (SC) | | 21-01550
|
01/22/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: January 29, 2021. (SC) | | 21-02031
|
01/29/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-02947
|
02/08/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. SFR Investments Pool 1 LLC shall have until February 19, 2021, to file and serve a motion to proceed as amicus curiae and the amicus curiae brief. (SC) | | 21-03725
|
02/12/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents Frank Timpa, Madelaine Timpa, and Timpa Trust shall have until March 15, 2021, to file and serve their answering brief. (SC) | | 21-04275
|
02/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-05083
|
02/19/2021 | Brief | Filed Brief of Amicus Curiae SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC in Support of Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-05084
|
02/24/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents Frank Timpa, Madelaine Timpa, and Timpa Trust's response to SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Appellant's Opening Brief due: March 12, 2021. (SC) | | 21-05437
|
02/25/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent Thornburg Mortgage Securities Trust 2007-3's answering brief due: March 15, 2021. (SC) | | 21-05550
|
02/25/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent Spanish Trail Master Association's answering brief due: March 15, 2021. (SC) | | 21-05551
|
02/25/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent Red Rock Financial Services, LLC shall have until March 15, 2021, to file and serve its answering brief. (SC) | | 21-05630
|
02/26/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent Thornburg Mortgage Securities Trust 2007-3's Limited Opposition to SFR Investment Pool 1, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (SC) | | 21-05849
|
03/11/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Proposed amicus curiae, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, has filed a motion for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae in support of appellant. The motion is granted. The amicus brief was filed on February 19, 2021. Respondents may address the issues raised in the amicus brief in their answering briefs, if deemed necessary. (SC) | | 21-07114
|
03/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent Spanish Trail Master Association's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-07325
|
03/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent Thornburg Mortgage Securities Trust 2007-3's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-07458
|
03/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Joint Motion for Order: (1) Extending Deadline to File Answering Briefs; (2) Extending Deadline to File Reply Brief; and (3) Increase Reply Brief Word Limit (First Request). (SC) | | 21-07466
|
03/19/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Joint Motion. Respondents shall have until April 15, 2021, to file and serve their answering briefs. Thereafter, appellant shall have until August 13, 2021, to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. Any reply brief filed by appellant shall not exceed 14,000 words. Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. fn1[The motions for extensions of time filed by Spanish Trail Master Association and Thornburg Mortgage Securities Trust 2007-3 are denied as moot.] fn2[Respondent Las Vegas Valley Water District did not participate in the joint motion. Nevertheless, Las Vegas Valley Water District shall have until April 15, 2021, to file and serve its answering brief. If no answering brief is timely filed, this appeal will be resolved without an answering brief from Las Vegas Valley Water District.] (SC) | | 21-08011
|
04/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent Red Rock Financial Services, LLC's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-10896
|
04/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent Spanish Trail Master Association's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-10915
|
04/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Supplemental Excerpts of Record. (SC) | | 21-10917
|
04/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent Thornburg Mortgage Securities Trust 2007-3's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-10976
|
04/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent Thornburg Mortgage Securities Trust 2007-3's Supplemental Appendix - Volume 1. (SC) | | 21-10977
|
04/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent Timpa Trust's Answering Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 04/16/21). (SC) | | |
04/16/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. | | 21-11003
|
04/16/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent Timpa Trust's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-11106
|
06/04/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Document. To date, respondent Republic Services has failed to file an answering brief. Republic Services shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answering brief. Failure to comply with this order will result in resolution of this appeal without an answering brief from Republic Services. (SC) | | 21-16041
|
08/13/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-23699
|
08/16/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
11/04/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Thornburg Mortgage Securities Trust 2007-3. (SC) | | 21-31729
|
11/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall remove Scott R. Lachman, Melanie D. Morgan, Ariel E. Stern, and Akerman LLP as counsel for Thornburg on the docket of this appeal. Thornburg shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance in this court. (SC) | | 21-32629
|
11/19/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL - FILED IN INCORRECT CASE) (SC) | | |
12/06/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. (SC) | | 21-34724
|
01/05/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the en banc court as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. (SC) | | 22-00419
|
01/06/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. (SC) | | 22-00522
|
01/31/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Substitution of Attorneys. (SC) | | 22-03270
|
05/12/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent Thornburg Mortgage's Notice of Appearance for Vanessa M. Turley. (SC) | | 22-15034
|
05/26/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Stiglich/Cadish/Silver/Pickering/Herndon. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 35. En Banc. (SC). | | 22-16707
|
06/13/2022 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Roger Croteau. E-Payment Ref. no. 22061018197891. (SC) | | |
06/13/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-18731
|
07/01/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC) | | 22-20836
|
07/26/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. {SC} | | 22-23418
|
07/26/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed {SC} | | |
08/16/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 28, 2022. (SC) | | 22-23418
|